Kivalu v. Northcentral University et al
Plaintiff: Taniela F Kivalu
Defendant: Northcentral University, Trustees Board Members of Northcentral University, Unknow Parties, United States Credit Bureaus, Michael Cahill, Sam Barstosky and United States Department of Education
Case Number: 2:2021cv00379
Filed: March 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Referring Judge: Michael T Morrissey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and denying #3 Motion to Allow Electronic Filing and #7 Motion to Amend Complaint. The Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is dismissed with leave until 5/24/21 to file and amended complaint. The Clerk shall enter judgment of dismissal if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 4/26/21. (DXD)
March 24, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE re: Certified Service Conformed Copies and Unissued Summons by Taniela F Kivalu. (DXD)
March 17, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Steven P Logan. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-21-379-PHX-SPL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 12, 2021 Filing 10 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 12, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Submitted by Taniela F Kivalu. (DXD)
March 12, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Taniela F Kivalu. (DXD)
March 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE re: Certified Service Addressed to Taniela F Kivalu by Taniela F Kivalu. (DXD)
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (DXD)
March 4, 2021 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-00379-PHX-MTM. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(DXD)
March 4, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Taniela F Kivalu. (DXD)
March 4, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Taniela F Kivalu. (DXD)
March 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Taniela F Kivalu. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(DXD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kivalu v. Northcentral University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northcentral University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees Board Members of Northcentral University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknow Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Credit Bureaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Barstosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taniela F Kivalu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?