PS Global LLC v. Ox Nutrition LLC
Plaintiff: PS Global LLC
Defendant: Ox Nutrition LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00380
Filed: March 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by PS Global LLC: Certificate of Service re: Summon Complaint upon Ox Nutrition LLC on April 8, 2021. (Graham, Danielle)
April 12, 2021 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by PS Global LLC: Affidavit of Service re: Summon Complaint upon Ox Nutrition LLC on April 8, 2021. (Graham, Danielle)
March 10, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by PS Global LLC. (Graham, Danielle)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER/NOTICE directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on June 7, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 3/08/2021. (REK)
March 5, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(MYE)
March 5, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ox Nutrition LLC. (MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 5, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19221669. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-380-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
March 5, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PS Global LLC. (Graham, Danielle) (MYE)
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by PS Global LLC. (Graham, Danielle) (MYE)
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19221669 filed by PS Global LLC. (Graham, Danielle) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PS Global LLC v. Ox Nutrition LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PS Global LLC
Represented By: Danielle Kathryn Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ox Nutrition LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?