Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company v. Jones Stephens Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Defendant: Jones Stephens Corporation, Unknown Parties, Watts Regulator Company and Watts Water Technologies Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv00418
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the parties' Stipulation (Doc. #21 ). Watts Regulator Company and Watts Water Technologies, Inc. shall have an extension to May 13, 20201 in which to respond to Jones Stephens Corporation's Crossclaim (Doc. #16 ). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 4/27/21. (SST)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED denying the parties' Stipulation for Dismissal (Doc. #19 ). (See Order for details.) Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 4/26/21. (SST)
April 23, 2021 Filing 21 STIPULATION re: #16 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO CROSS-CLAIM by Watts Regulator Company, Watts Water Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Polson, Adam)
April 15, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #19 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST)
April 15, 2021 Filing 19 *STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Watts Water Technologies by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice)(Schumacher, Douglas) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violation on 4/19/2021 (SST).
April 8, 2021 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jones Stephens Corporation. (Smith, Jeffrey)
April 8, 2021 Filing 17 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Jones Stephens Corporation. (Smith, Jeffrey)
April 8, 2021 Filing 16 Defendant Jones Stephens Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Watts Water Technologies Incorporated by Jones Stephens Corporation.(Smith, Jeffrey)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the parties' Motion (Doc. #13 ). Plaintiff shall have an extension to April 15, 2021 in which to respond to Defendant Watts Water Technologies, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #8 ). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 4/5/21. (SST)
April 1, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #13 Stipulation filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST)
April 1, 2021 Filing 13 *STIPULATION re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Extend Time)(Schumacher, Douglas) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violation on 4/5/2021 (SST).
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re: #4 Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement as to Jones Stephens Corporation, which was due 3/29/2021. Counsel shall file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 4/5/2021. Entered by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 4/1/2021. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ)
March 26, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #10 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
March 25, 2021 Filing 10 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Schumacher, Douglas) *Modified to add corporate parents and to reflect document is not in compliance with the local rule; attorney notified on 3/26/2021 (MFR).
March 18, 2021 Filing 9 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Watts Water Technologies Incorporated. (Polson, Adam)
March 18, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Watts Water Technologies Incorporated. (Polson, Adam)
March 18, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Watts Regulator Company.(Polson, Adam)
March 11, 2021 Filing 6 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 5 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only), #1 Notice of Removal CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendants Watts Regulator Company, Watts Water Technologies Incorporated. (Polson, Adam)
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Watts Regulator Company, Watts Water Technologies Incorporated. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC)
March 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, Jones Stephens Corporation. (ARC)
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19243764. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-418-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Watts Regulator Company, Watts Water Technologies Incorporated. (Polson, Adam) (ARC)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2021-050047. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19243764 filed by Watts Water Technologies Incorporated, Watts Regulator Company. (Polson, Adam) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(ARC)
March 11, 2021 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Waiver of Service of Summons as to Jones Stephens Corporation on 2/17/2021. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 2/22/2021); Upon Watts Regulator Company and Watts Water Technologies Incorporated on 2/10/2021. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 2/22/2021). (ARC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company v. Jones Stephens Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones Stephens Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey Lincoln Smith
Represented By: Amanda M Breemes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watts Regulator Company
Represented By: Adam S Polson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watts Water Technologies Incorporated
Represented By: Adam S Polson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Douglas Michael Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?