Gentry et al v. Megagen Implant Company Limited et al
Plaintiff: Frank Gentry and Jill Gentry
Defendant: Megagen USA Incorporated, Megagen Implant Company Limited and R2Gate America Incorporated a New Jersey corporation doing business as Megagen
Case Number: 2:2021cv00440
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #8 Answer to Complaint filed by R2Gate America Incorporated, Megagen USA Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - Documents shall be converted to PDF directly from a word processing program and per Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual must be text searchable. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference is set for 6/29/2021 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P. Logan. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 5/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(LMR)
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Megagen USA Incorporated, R2Gate America Incorporated.(Shin, Seung)
April 27, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Seung Han Shin on behalf of Defendants Megagen USA Incorporated, R2Gate America Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 7, 2021 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Frank Gentry, Jill Gentry: Return of Service re: summons and Complaint upon Megagen USA, Inc. and R2Gate America, Inc. on 03/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Return of service on R2Gate America)(Saunders, Joseph)
March 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H Saunders on behalf of Frank Gentry, Jill Gentry. (Saunders, Joseph)
March 22, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Joseph H Saunders on behalf of Plaintiffs Frank Gentry, Jill Gentry. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRELIMINARY ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on June 14, 2021, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 3/16/2021. (LMR)
March 15, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Megagen Implant Company Limited, Megagen USA Incorporated, R2Gate America Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 15, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19252358. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-440-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
March 15, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Frank Gentry, Jill Gentry. (Leshner, Stephen) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(JAM)
March 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19252358 filed by Jill Gentry, Frank Gentry. (Leshner, Stephen) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gentry et al v. Megagen Implant Company Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megagen USA Incorporated
Represented By: Seung Han Shin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megagen Implant Company Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R2Gate America Incorporated a New Jersey corporation doing business as Megagen
Represented By: Seung Han Shin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Gentry
Represented By: Stephen I Leshner
Represented By: Joseph H Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Gentry
Represented By: Stephen I Leshner
Represented By: Joseph H Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?