Smith v. Bytedance Limited
Plaintiff: Curtis Smith
Defendant: Bytedance Limited
Case Number: 2:2021cv00443
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michelle H Burns
Referring Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2021 Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER: On the Court's own motion, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for October 7, 2021 at 11:30 AM is vacated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAMA)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 JUDGMENT - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the Parties' Stipulated Motion for Entry of Order and Judgment (Doc. #26 ) and final judgment is entered in this matter as follows: JUDGMENT is hereby entered, pursuant to Rule 65(d) of the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure ("FRCP"), against Mr. Smith on all his claims against Bytedance Ltd., and for Bytedance Ltd. on all its claims against Mr. Smith. This Order and Judgment is binding on Mr. Smith and his affiliates pursuant to FRCP Rule 65(d)(2)(B). This Court will maintain jurisdiction over this case to construe, enforce and/or implement the terms of this Stipulation and Order upon application by any party, and for the purpose of making any orders that are necessary or proper for the construction, modification, or enforcement of this Stipulation and Order, or for the punishment of any violation thereof. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dismissing this action with prejudice. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/23/21. (SMH)
September 17, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Judgment STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER AND JUDGMENT by Bytedance Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order and Judgment)(Grady, Douglas)
August 2, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Curtis Smith. (1 page) (SMH)
July 19, 2021 Filing 23 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Curtis Smith, Curtis Smith. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (BAS)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/7/2021 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/12/2021. (JAMA)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filin g an amended pleading. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/12/2021. (JAMA)
July 12, 2021 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleadings #14 and #15 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header (REK)
July 9, 2021 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge John J Tuchi. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-21-443-PHX-JJT. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 9, 2021 Filing 18 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE for 9/17/2021 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 303, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns. See order for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 7/8/21. (SMH)
July 7, 2021 Filing 15 Plaintiff's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to #9 Defendant Bytedance LTD's Counterclaims by Curtis Smith. (9 pages) (Note: Signature date differs on this pleading from #14 ). (SMH)
July 6, 2021 Filing 14 Plaintiff's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to #9 Defendant Bytedance LTD's Counterclaims by Curtis Smith. (9 pages) (SMH)
July 2, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE re: Certificate of Service by Bytedance Limited re: #10 Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, #9 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, #8 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel, #11 Corporate Disclosure Statement . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Grady, Douglas)
June 25, 2021 Filing 12 Magistrate Election Form Deadline. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP)
June 25, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bytedance Limited. (Grady, Douglas)
June 25, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Bytedance Limited. (Grady, Douglas)
June 25, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand with Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Curtis Smith by Bytedance Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Grady, Douglas)
June 25, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Clair Christine Pena on behalf of Bytedance Limited. (Pena, Clair)
June 25, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Douglas Anderson Grady on behalf of Counter Claimant Bytedance Limited, Defendant Bytedance Limited. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 25, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Bryan C Taylor, Chunmeng Yang on behalf of Counter Claimant Bytedance Limited, Defendant Bytedance Limited. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 14, 2021 Filing 6 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 16, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Bytedance Limited. (LAD)
March 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (LAD)
March 15, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX227045. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-00443-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Instructions)(LAD)
March 15, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Curtis Smith. (LAD) (2 pages)
March 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number PHX227045 filed by Curtis Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (LAD) (12 pages)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Bytedance Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bytedance Limited
Represented By: Bryan C Taylor
Represented By: Chunmeng Yang
Represented By: Douglas Anderson Grady
Represented By: Clair Christine Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?