Stockfood America Incorporated v. Classic Cooking School LLC
Plaintiff: Stockfood America Incorporated
Defendant: Classic Cooking School LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00477
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. #11 ), Civil Case Terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
April 21, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Stockfood America Incorporated. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant (s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on June 18, 2021, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 3/23/21. (MAW)
March 22, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jonah Adam Grossbardt on behalf of Plaintiff Stockfood America Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Stockfood America Incorporated. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (JAM)
March 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Stockfood America Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAM)
March 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Document incomplete - Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Stockfood America Incorporated. (JAM)
March 19, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Classic Cooking School LLC. (JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 19, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(JAM)
March 19, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19271521. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-477-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
March 19, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Stockfood America Incorporated. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (JAM)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stockfood America Incorporated. (JAM)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19271521 filed by Stockfood America Incorporated. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stockfood America Incorporated v. Classic Cooking School LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stockfood America Incorporated
Represented By: Jonah Adam Grossbardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classic Cooking School LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?