USADATA Incorporated v. DataWidget LLC et al
Plaintiff: USADATA Incorporated
Defendant: E-Printwerx International LLC doing business as LeadsPlease.com and DataWidget LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00526
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles
Referring Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by E-Printwerx International LLC: re: Waiver of the Service of Summons upon E-Printwerx International LLC d/b/a LeadsPlease.com on 4/13/2021. (Scaglione, Gregory)
April 13, 2021 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by DataWidget LLC: re: Waiver of the Service of Summons upon DataWidget, LLC on 4/13/2021. (Scaglione, Gregory)
April 13, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Gregory Scaglione on behalf of Defendants DataWidget LLC, E-Printwerx International LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
April 13, 2021 Remark: Out of state attorney Christopher Strate terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 13, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Christopher Hoskins Strate on behalf of Plaintiff USADATA Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
April 8, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Thomas Jeffrey Bean on behalf of Plaintiff USADATA Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
April 6, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Wendy Risa Stein on behalf of Plaintiff USADATA Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 1, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by USADATA Incorporated. (LaCorte, Brian)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) or 12(c) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/31/2021. (CLB)
March 31, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Douglas L Rayes. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-21-526-PHX-DLR. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 30, 2021 Filing 8 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 26, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to DataWidget LLC, E-Printwerx International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
March 26, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(SCA)
March 26, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19292384. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Camille D. Bibles. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-00526-PHX-CDB. Magistrate Election form attached. (SCA)
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by USADATA Incorporated. (LaCorte, Brian) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SCA)
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by USADATA Incorporated. (LaCorte, Brian) (SCA)
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19292384 filed by USADATA Incorporated.(LaCorte, Brian) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(SCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USADATA Incorporated v. DataWidget LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E-Printwerx International LLC doing business as LeadsPlease.com
Represented By: Gregory Scaglione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DataWidget LLC
Represented By: Gregory Scaglione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USADATA Incorporated
Represented By: Andrew Michael Hensley
Represented By: Jonathon Andrew Talcott
Represented By: Thomas J Bean
Represented By: Wendy R Stein
Represented By: Christopher H Strate
Represented By: Brian William LaCorte
Represented By: Christopher Hoskins Strate
Represented By: Wendy Risa Stein
Represented By: Thomas Jeffrey Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?