National Western Life Insurance Company v. McComas et al
Plaintiff: National Western Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Barbara Jean Kane, James Franklin Ryan, Chris Klock Ministries Incorporated, Judith McComas and St. Jude Children's Research Hospital
Case Number: 2:2021cv00580
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2021 Filing 18 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by National Western Life Insurance Company: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on April 9, 2021 to St. Jude Children's Research Hospital . (Demlong, William)
April 27, 2021 Filing 17 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by National Western Life Insurance Company: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on April 8, 2021 to Chris Klock Ministries, Inc. . (Demlong, William)
April 19, 2021 Filing 16 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 19, 2021 Filing 14 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 19, 2021 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by National Western Life Insurance Company: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on April 8, 2021 to Judith McComas . (Demlong, William)
April 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE re: of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons to St. Jude Children's Research Hospital by National Western Life Insurance Company . (Demlong, William)
April 8, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE re: of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons to Barbara Jean Kane by National Western Life Insurance Company . (Demlong, William)
April 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE re: of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons to Judith McComas by National Western Life Insurance Company . (Demlong, William)
April 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE re: of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons to James Franklin Ryan by National Western Life Insurance Company . (Demlong, William)
April 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE re: of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons on Chris Klock Ministries, Inc. by National Western Life Insurance Company . (Demlong, William)
April 6, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Judith McComas, Barbara Jean Kane, James Franklin Ryan, Chris Klock Ministries Incorporated, St. Jude Children's Research Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 5, 2021 Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19325579. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-580-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (MYE)
April 5, 2021 Filing 4 EXPEDITED EX PARTE MOTION for Leave to Deposit Funds with the Court and Application for Order to Invest Funds by National Western Life Insurance Company. (Demlong, William) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MYE)
April 5, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by National Western Life Insurance Company. (Demlong, William) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(MYE)
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Western Life Insurance Company. (Demlong, William) (MYE)
April 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19325579 filed by National Western Life Insurance Company. (Demlong, William) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Western Life Insurance Company v. McComas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Jean Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Franklin Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Klock Ministries Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith McComas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Jude Children's Research Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Western Life Insurance Company
Represented By: William M Demlong
Represented By: John Kristian Wittwer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?