Leyva v. Avila et al
Plaintiff: Gonzalo Leyva
Defendant: DGO Tile and Granite LLC, Maricela N Medrano and Alberto Silva Avila
Case Number: 2:2021cv00635
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference is set for 6/29/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 501, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Steven P. Logan. See order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 5/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(LMR)
May 5, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Alberto Silva Avila, DGO Tile and Granite LLC.(Dessaules, Jonathan)
April 22, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Gonzalo Leyva. Party Maricela N Medrano (a married couple) terminated. (Enoch, Nicholas)
April 22, 2021 Filing 8 PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Gonzalo Leyva. (Enoch, Nicholas)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The parties' Stipulation #6 is granted. Defendants shall have until May 5, 2021, to file an answer to the Complaint and otherwise respond as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 4/21/2021. (LMR)
April 21, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Notice of Removal Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendants to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Alberto Silva Avila, DGO Tile and Granite LLC, Maricela N Medrano. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dessaules, Jonathan)
April 16, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DGO Tile and Granite LLC. (Dessaules, Jonathan)
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 *NOTICE re: Service of #3 Preliminary Order by Gonzalo Leyva . (Enoch, Nicholas) *Modified to add document link on 4/16/2021 (REK).
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRELIMINARY ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 4/14/2021. (LMR)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19358497. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-635-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2021-003632. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19358497 filed by Alberto Silva Avila, Maricela N Medrano, DGO Tile and Granite LLC. (Dessaules, Jonathan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A)(MYE)
April 14, 2021 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, Civil Cover Sheet upon Alberto Silva Avila and Maricela N Medrano on 3/15/2021. (Originals filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 3/18/2021.) Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, Civil Cover Sheet upon DGO Tile and Granite LLC on 3/24/2021. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 3/26/2021.) (MYE) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leyva v. Avila et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DGO Tile and Granite LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Adam Dessaules
Represented By: Douglas M Imperi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricela N Medrano
Represented By: Jonathan Adam Dessaules
Represented By: Douglas M Imperi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberto Silva Avila
Represented By: Jonathan Adam Dessaules
Represented By: Douglas M Imperi, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gonzalo Leyva
Represented By: Nicholas Jason Enoch
Represented By: Clara Stephanie Acosta
Represented By: William W Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?