United States of America v. Six Firearms
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Six Firearms
Case Number: 2:2021cv00672
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Referring Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF PARTIAL DEFAULT against Jessica Graham as to Six Firearms. (DXD)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff United States of America against the interest of Jessica Graham in defendant property. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wenker, Mark)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by United States of America: Proof of Service re: Notice of Forfeiture, verified Complaint for Forfeiture and Scheduling Order upon Jessica Graham on April 28, 2021. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proof of Service)(Wenker, Mark)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE re: Arrest of Defendants by ATF pursuant to Warrant #4 by United States of America re: #4 Warrant Issued . (Wenker, Mark)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - The civil forfeiture action shall be transferred to this Court for all further proceedings. All future pleadings shall bear the following case caption: CV-21-00672-PHX-DWL. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 5/5/21. (DXD)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WARRANT for Arrest in Rem issued as to Defendants. (DXD)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due 6 months from the date the case is at issue. Dispositive motions due 7 months from the date both an answer and claim are filed. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 4/20/21. (DXD)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-672-PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM filed by United States of America. (Wenker, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Verification)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Six Firearms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Six Firearms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Mark James Wenker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?