Meeks v. Penzone et al
Plaintiff: Leonard Antonio Meeks and Leonard Meeks
Defendant: Tempe Police Department, Maricopa County, Unknown Penzone, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office and Maricopa, County of
Case Number: 2:2021cv00683
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Morrissey (PS)
Referring Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The First Amended Complaint (Doc. #7 ) is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a second amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file a second amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/9/2021. (WLP)
May 28, 2021 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Maricopa, County of, Unknown Penzone, Tempe Police Department, Maricopa County Sheriff's Office filed by Leonard Antonio Meeks. (5 pages) (WLP)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Leonard Antonio Meeks, inmate #234943. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 5/13/2021. (WLP)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is granted. As required by the accompanying Order to the appropriate government agency, Plaintiff must pay the $350.00 filing fee and is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $9.62. The Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) and deny any pending unrelated motions as moot. The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 5/13/2021. (WLP)
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (WLP)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Leonard Antonio Meeks. (4 pages) (WLP)
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Leonard Antonio Meeks. (2 pages) (WLP)
April 20, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Leonard Antonio Meeks. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (4 pages, page numbers not sequential) (WLP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meeks v. Penzone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Antonio Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tempe Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Penzone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?