Geary v. Consumer Cellular Incorporated
Plaintiff: Diana Geary
Defendant: Consumer Cellular Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv00699
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Zackary S Kaylor on behalf of Plaintiff Diana Geary. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 12, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jacob Rusch on behalf of Plaintiff Diana Geary. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 5, 2021 Remark: Out of state attorneys Jacob Rusch and Timothy J Baker terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - The parties are advised, pursuant to LRCiv 12.1(c), that motions to dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and motions for judgment on the pleadings under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(c) are discouraged if the defect(s) in the complaint can be cured by a permissible amendment. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/22/2021. (WLP)
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Consumer Cellular Incorporated. (REM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19387599. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L. Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-00699-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REM)
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Diana Geary.(Traulsen, Richard) (REM)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19387599 filed by Diana Geary.(Traulsen, Richard) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(REM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geary v. Consumer Cellular Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumer Cellular Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Geary
Represented By: Timothy J Becker
Represented By: Jacob Rusch
Represented By: Richard Phillip Traulsen
Represented By: Zackary S Kaylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?