United States of America v. $520.34 in US Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Pistol, Romarm/Cugir Draco, 762 Caliber, SN: None, Obliterated, Glock 17 Unknown High Capacity Magazine, Unknown Caliber, SN: None, Pistol, Glock Incorporated 17, 9 Caliber, SN: HL198US, Rifle, Norinco (North China Industries) MAK90, 762 Caliber, SN: None, Rifle, Romarm/Cugir GP WASR 10/63, 762 Caliber, SN: None, Obliterate, $2,239.00 in US Currency and $520.34 in US Currency
Case Number: 2:2021cv00815
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by United States of America: Service by Publication. Last publication date June 11, 2021 and by U.S. Mail to Norbert Payan-Armenta. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of Publication, Notice of Forfeiture Action, Advertisement Certification Report, #2 Supplement Notice of Forfeiture Action to Norbert Payan-Armenta)(Wenker, Mark)
June 1, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE re: Arrest of Defendants in Rem by the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms and Explosives by United States of America . (Wenker, Mark)
May 10, 2021 Filing 9 WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM issued (REK)
May 10, 2021 Filing 8 Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 10, 2021 Filing 7 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: The deadline for completing discovery is six (6) months from the date both an answer and claim are filed. The deadline for filing dispositive motions is seven (7) months from the date both an answer and claim are filed. If this matter is stayed pending related criminal proceedings, a written joint status report shall be due every six (6) months from the date of the Order to stay case. Failure to comply with the deadlines herein set shall result in dismissal of the case pursuant to LRCiv. 41.1. Plaintiff shall serve Claimant with a copy of this Order within 15 days of any appearance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 5/07/2021. (REK)
May 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE re: of Filing Correct Document JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet Pursuant to Notice of Filer of Deficiency Document Number 3 by United States of America re: #1 Complaint . (Wenker, Mark)
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Civil Cover Sheet filed by United States of America. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please file correct document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-815-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (DLC)
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM filed by United States of America. (Wenker, Mark) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Verification)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $520.34 in US Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pistol, Romarm/Cugir Draco, 762 Caliber, SN: None, Obliterated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glock 17 Unknown High Capacity Magazine, Unknown Caliber, SN: None
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pistol, Glock Incorporated 17, 9 Caliber, SN: HL198US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rifle, Norinco (North China Industries) MAK90, 762 Caliber, SN: None
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rifle, Romarm/Cugir GP WASR 10/63, 762 Caliber, SN: None, Obliterate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $2,239.00 in US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $520.34 in US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Mark James Wenker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?