Shoppes at Mirador Square LLC v. Wild Oats Markets Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Shoppes at Mirador Square LLC
Defendant: Whole Foods Market Incorporated, Wild Oats Markets Incorporated and WFM-WO Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv00831
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER setting a Telephonic Case Management Conference for 8/13/2021 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. See attached Order for details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 6/8/2021. (KFZ)
June 8, 2021 Filing 15 *ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by WFM-WO Incorporated. (Bennett, Matthew) *Modified filers on 6/9/2021 (WLP).
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - Before the Court are Defendant Wild Oats Markets Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Doc. #10 ) and the parties' Stipulation Permitting Filing of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial (Doc. #12 ). After review, the Court finds the Motion to Dismiss does not comply with LRCiv 12.1(c) and thus will strike the motion. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to strike Defendant Wild Oats Markets Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Doc. #10 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting the parties' Stipulation (Doc. #12 ). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 6/2/2021. (WLP)
May 25, 2021 Filing 13 *FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wild Oats Markets Incorporated and WFM-WO Incorporated filed by Shoppes at Mirador Square LLC.(Wulkan, Lawrence) *Modified to correct parties on 6/9/2021 (WLP).
May 25, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION Stipulation Permitting Filing of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Shoppes at Mirador Square LLC. (Wulkan, Lawrence)
May 17, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shoppes at Mirador Square LLC. (Chavez, Adrianna)
May 14, 2021 Filing 10 *STRICKEN pursuant to #14 Order -- MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Whole Foods Market Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Matthew E. Bennett)(Bennett, Matthew) *Modified on 6/2/2021 (WLP).
May 14, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Whole Foods Market Incorporated, Wild Oats Markets Incorporated.(Bennett, Matthew)
May 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Ethan Bennett on behalf of Whole Foods Market Incorporated, Wild Oats Markets Incorporated. (Bennett, Matthew)
May 11, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Whole Foods Market Incorporated, Wild Oats Markets Incorporated identifying Other Affiliate Amazon.com, Inc. for Whole Foods Market Incorporated. (Swartz, Ryan)
May 11, 2021 Filing 6 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Whole Foods Market Incorporated, Wild Oats Markets Incorporated. (Swartz, Ryan)
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Shoppes at Mirador Square LLC. (DLC)
May 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Whole Foods Market Incorporated, Wild Oats Markets Incorporated. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please file correct document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC)
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Whole Foods Market Incorporated, Wild Oats Markets Incorporated. (DLC)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19448968. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-831-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2021-005833. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19448968 filed by Whole Foods Market Incorporated, Wild Oats Markets Incorporated. (Swartz, Ryan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Coversheet, #3 Exhibit A)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shoppes at Mirador Square LLC v. Wild Oats Markets Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whole Foods Market Incorporated
Represented By: Mark Thomas Collinsworth
Represented By: Ryan Paul Swartz
Represented By: Matthew Ethan Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wild Oats Markets Incorporated
Represented By: Mark Thomas Collinsworth
Represented By: Ryan Paul Swartz
Represented By: Matthew Ethan Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFM-WO Incorporated
Represented By: Mark Thomas Collinsworth
Represented By: Ryan Paul Swartz
Represented By: Matthew Ethan Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shoppes at Mirador Square LLC
Represented By: James Edward Holland, Jr.
Represented By: Adrianna Mirella Chavez
Represented By: Lawrence J Wulkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?