Horsman v. Jefferson et al
Plaintiff: Patrick B Horsman
Defendant: Ian Lev and Brett R Jefferson
Case Number: 2:2021cv00841
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Filing 19 Acknowledgment of Remand from Maricopa County Superior Court. (WLP)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED denying Defendant Brett R. Jefferson's Response to Order to Show Cause As To Why This Action Was Properly Removed And Should Not Be Remanded (Doc. #11 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case be remanded to the Superior Court of Arizona in Maricopa County. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter) (WLP)
July 19, 2021 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re: #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Patrick B Horsman. (Fredenberg, Daniel)
July 6, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE re: Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Disposition by Brett R Jefferson re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case Summarily . (Weisz, David)
July 6, 2021 Filing 15 *WITHDRAWN by Doc. #16 * MOTION to Dismiss Case Summarily by Brett R Jefferson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Weisz, David) Modified on 7/6/2021 (MAW).
June 17, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Brett R Jefferson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Weisz, David)
June 10, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Steven R Andrews, Ryan J Andrews, David A Weisz on behalf of Defendants Brett R Jefferson, Ian Lev. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 9, 2021 Filing 13 *OPPOSITION to #11 Response to Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Patrick B Horsman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Fredenberg, Daniel) *Modified text on 6/10/2021 (WLP).
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED GRANTING Defendant Brett R. Jefferson's First Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer of Responsive Pleading (Doc. #5 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Brett R. Jefferson shall file an answer or responsive pleading on or before June 17, 2021. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/3/21. (MAW)
June 1, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, #4 Order, Set Deadlines by Defendant Brett R Jefferson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wilenchik, John)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Brett R. Jefferson shall file a response to the Court's Order to Show Cause on or before June 1, 2021. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 5/27/21. (MAW)
May 27, 2021 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs Response to Courts Order to Show Cause Defendant Jeffersons Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Response to the Courts Order to Show Cause by Brett R Jefferson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilenchik, John)
May 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #7 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Patrick B Horsman. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type, not all caps. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
May 25, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #5 First MOTION for Extension of Time Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading filed by Patrick B Horsman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fredenberg, Daniel)
May 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE re: Notice of Filing Response in Opposition to Motion to Consolidate by Brett R Jefferson . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Wilenchik, John)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED First MOTION for Extension of Time Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading by Brett R Jefferson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Wilenchik, John)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Brett Jefferson show cause in writing within 14 days from the date of this Order why this case should not be remanded as non-removable pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1441 (b)(2) [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 5/13/21. (MAW)
May 11, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19454969. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-841-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Brett R Jefferson: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, and Civil Coversheet upon Brett Jefferson on April 16, 2021. (Original filed in Maricopa County on April 28, 2021). (JAM) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
May 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2021-006034. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19454969 filed by Brett R Jefferson. (Wilenchik, John) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horsman v. Jefferson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Lev
Represented By: John Douglas Wilenchik
Represented By: David A Weisz
Represented By: Ryan J Andrews
Represented By: Steven R Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett R Jefferson
Represented By: John Douglas Wilenchik
Represented By: David A Weisz
Represented By: Ryan J Andrews
Represented By: Steven R Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick B Horsman
Represented By: Christopher S Skinner
Represented By: Christian CM Beams
Represented By: Daniel Edward Fredenberg
Represented By: Christopher Spencer Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?