Liberty Insurance Corporation v. Harbor Freight Tools USA Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Harbor Freight Tools USA Incorporated and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2021cv00861
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall, without further notice, dismiss entire case on 8/20/2021, with prejudice, unless prior thereto a party withdraws the Notice of Settlement (Doc. #13 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any pending deadlines in this matter are stayed. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 7/6/2021. (RMW)
July 6, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement by Harbor Freight Tools USA Incorporated. (Wiberg, Ashley)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 4/1/2022. Dispositive motions due by 4/29/2022. See attachment for details. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 6/10/2021. (CLB)
June 10, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Michael T. Liburdi: Scheduling Conference held on 6/10/2021. Case management deadlines discussed and set. Separate order to issue. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Philip Berens for Plaintiff. Telephonic appearance by Ashley Wiberg for Defendant. (Court Reporter Barbara Stockford) Hearing held 10:28 AM to 10:48 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
May 28, 2021 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Harbor Freight Tools USA Incorporated. (Wiberg, Ashley)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for Thursday, 6/10/2021 at 10:30 AM. Counsel will receive call-in instructions via email to participate in the hearing. The parties must jointly file the Joint Proposed Case Management Report with the Clerk of the Court at least 10 days before the Scheduling Conference. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 5/14/2021. (RMW)
May 14, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Harbor Freight Tools USA Incorporated. (Wiberg, Ashley)
May 14, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Liberty Insurance Corporation. (JAM)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Harbor Freight Tools USA Incorporated. (JAM)
May 13, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal (Complaint) by Harbor Freight Tools USA Incorporated. (Wiberg, Ashley) (JAM)
May 13, 2021 Filing 7 VERIFICATION OF REMOVAL FILINGS by Harbor Freight Tools USA Incorporated. (Wiberg, Ashley) (JAM)
May 13, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19465648. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-861-PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Harbor Freight Tools USA Incorporated: Certificate of Service of Process re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Charleigh Webb, Office Specialist on 4/23/21. (Original filed in Pinal County Superior Court on 4/28/21). (JAM) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pinal County Superior Court, case number S1100CV202100846. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19465648 filed by Harbor Freight Tools USA Incorporated. (Wiberg, Ashley) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Insurance Corporation v. Harbor Freight Tools USA Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Philip Joseph Berens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Freight Tools USA Incorporated
Represented By: Craig Aaron Logsdon
Represented By: Ashley N Wiberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?