Beltran v. Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated
Plaintiff: Ann Beltran
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv00864
Filed: May 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Referring Judge: Michael T Morrissey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 12/3/2021. Dispositive motions due by 3/4/2022. IT IS ORDERED the 7/02/2021 Rule 16 Case Management Conference is VACATED. On 3/18/2022 at 8:45 a.m. (15 minutes allowed), the court will conduct a telephonic trial setting conference. Participants shall have their calendars available for the conference. The parties will receive dial-in instructions for connecting to the teleconference via electronic mail prior to the hearing. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 6/29/2021. (ESG)
June 25, 2021 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated. (Neumeyer, Coree)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER pursuant to the Joint #15 Motion for Extension of Time, IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. shall have up to and including 6/18/2021 to file its reply in support of its #12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 6/17/2021. (ESG)
June 15, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant's Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated. (Roberts, Daniel)
June 11, 2021 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #13 Response to Motion by Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Neumeyer, Coree)
June 8, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #13 Response to Motion filed by Ann Beltran. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST)
June 7, 2021 Filing 13 *RESPONSE to Motion re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ann Beltran. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Webster, James) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violation on 6/8/2021 (SST).
May 21, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Roberts, Daniel)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 7/02/2021 at 9:30 a.m. (15 minutes allowed). The parties will receive dial-in instructions for connecting to the teleconference via electronic mail prior to the hearing. See attached order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 5/20/2021. (ESG)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 5/20/2021. (ESG)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 5/20/2021. (ESG)
May 20, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan M Brnovich. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-21-864-PHX-SMB. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 19, 2021 Filing 7 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
May 14, 2021 Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19470377. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Morrissey. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-864-PHX-MTM. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (JAM)
May 14, 2021 Filing 4 VERIFICATION in Support of #1 Notice of Removal by Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated. (Roberts, Daniel) (JAM)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Carla Walters re: #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated. (Roberts, Daniel) (JAM)
May 14, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated. (Roberts, Daniel) (JAM)
May 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2021-090912. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19470377 filed by Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated. (Roberts, Daniel) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beltran v. Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated
Represented By: Daniel Geary Roberts
Represented By: Coree Elizabeth Neumeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Beltran
Represented By: James Portman Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?