Ritz v. Centurion of Arizona LLC et al
Plaintiff: Anthony L Ritz
Defendant: Stacey Elizabeth Stockton, Centurion of Arizona LLC, Unknown Parties, Dorothy Chinyere Igwe, Dahab Abdukkaliq and Corizon Health Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv00868
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Camille D Bibles (PS)
Referring Judge: Camille D Bibles
2 Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Corizon Health Incorporated.(Fernandez, Anthony)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties at ECF No. #15 , IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall have until September 1, 2021, to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. As this allows Defendants 72 days from the date the first Defendant was served (ECF No. #10 ) to answer the complaint, more than triple the time allowed pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, no further extensions of this deadline will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles on 7/15/21. (SST)
July 14, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Dahab Abdukkaliq, Centurion of Arizona LLC, Dorothy Chinyere Igwe, Stacey Elizabeth Stockton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prefontaine, Nicole)
July 14, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole M Prefontaine on behalf of Dahab Abdukkaliq, Centurion of Arizona LLC, Dorothy Chinyere Igwe, Stacey Elizabeth Stockton. (Prefontaine, Nicole)
June 28, 2021 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Anthony L Ritz: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Certificate of Medical Expert Necessity upon Dahab Abdukkaliq on 06/24/2021. (Hallinan, Joane)
June 28, 2021 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Anthony L Ritz: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Certificate of Medical Expert Necessity upon Stacey Elizabeth Stockton on 06/23/2021. (Hallinan, Joane)
June 22, 2021 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Anthony L Ritz: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Certificate of Medical Expert Necessity upon Centurion of Arizona, LLC on 06/21/2021. (Hallinan, Joane)
June 22, 2021 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Anthony L Ritz: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Certificate of Medical Expert Necessity upon Corizon Health Care, Inc. on 06/21/2021. (Hallinan, Joane)
May 25, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Dorothy Chinyere Igwe, Stacey Elizabeth Stockton. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 24, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Submitted by Anthony L Ritz. (Hallinan, Joane)
May 24, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Submitted by Anthony L Ritz. (Hallinan, Joane)
May 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #2 Summons Submitted filed by Anthony L Ritz. The summonses submitted for Defendants Dorothy Chinyere Igwe and Stacey Elizabeth Stockton were not issued. In order for the Clerk to issue a summons, the name of the party to be served on the summons must match the name of the party on the docket; any grammatical errors or abbreviation of the name is not permissible. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected summonses for the Clerk to issue. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST)
May 24, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Dahab Abdukkaliq, Centurion of Arizona LLC, Corizon Health Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (SST) *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff has 120 days from the filing date of this Order in which to discover, by subpoena or otherwise, the identity of one or more of the Doe Defendants, and to file a "notice of substitution" for each Doe Defendant. The Clerk of Court may enter a judgment of dismissal for failure to prosecute without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff, if Plaintiff fails to file a notice of substitution within 120 days for each of the Doe Defendants, unless Plaintiff seeks and is granted an extension of time. If properly completed, the Clerk of Court must issue the proposed Summonses filed at Doc. #2 . Plaintiff must either serve each named Defendant or seek a waiver of service for each named Defendant. If Plaintiff does not either obtain a waiver of service of the summons or complete service of the Summons and Complaint on a named Defendant within 90 days of the filing of the Complaint or within 60 days of the filing of this Order, whichever is later, the action may be dismissed as to each named Defendant not served. This matter is assigned to the standard track pursuant to Rule 16.2(b)(3) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Camille D. Bibles pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1). (See Order for full details.) Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/21/21. (SST)
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (SCA)
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Anthony L Ritz.(Hallinan, Joane) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(SCA)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19472684 filed by Anthony L Ritz. (37 pages) (Hallinan, Joane) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(SCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ritz v. Centurion of Arizona LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Elizabeth Stockton
Represented By: Nicole M Prefontaine
Represented By: Sarah Lynn Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion of Arizona LLC
Represented By: Nicole M Prefontaine
Represented By: Sarah Lynn Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Chinyere Igwe
Represented By: Nicole M Prefontaine
Represented By: Sarah Lynn Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dahab Abdukkaliq
Represented By: Nicole M Prefontaine
Represented By: Sarah Lynn Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health Incorporated
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony L Ritz
Represented By: Joane E Hallinan
Represented By: Jeremy Wade Killpack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?