Winton v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Tammy Leann Winton
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv00872
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting the application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ), without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefor. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service of the summons and complaint. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 5/19/2021. (RMW)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Within 60 days after the answer is filed, Plaintiff must file an opening brief. Defendant must file an answering brief within 30 days after service of Plaintiff's opening brief. Plaintiff may file a reply brief within 15 days after service of Defendant's answering brief. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/18/21. (DXD)
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-872-PHX-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Tammy Leann Winton. (Vidrine, Dustin) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(DLC)
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Tammy Leann Winton. (Vidrine, Dustin) (DLC)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Tammy Leann Winton. (Vidrine, Dustin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winton v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Leann Winton
Represented By: Dustin Paul Vidrine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?