Buttacavoli v. Worth Ross Management Company Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Buttacavoli
Defendant: Candlewyck Condiminium Association and Worth Ross Management Company Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv00979
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John Z Boyle
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2021 Filing 24 Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 15, 2021 Filing 25 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 12, 2021 Filing 22 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #15 Joint Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Brittney Horstman is withdrawn as counsel, and attorney Mark Lines is substituted as counsel of record herein for Defendant Candlewyck Condominium Association. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 7/12/21. (DXD)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - Plaintiff shall have until 8/6/2021 to file a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #11 ). Defendant shall file any reply within 7 days from the date Plaintiff's response is filed. The Motion shall be deemed ready for decision without oral argument on the day following the date set for filing a reply unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 7/12/21. (DXD)
July 12, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #15 MOTION to Substitute Attorney for Defendants. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Please correct future pleadings. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
July 9, 2021 Filing 17 *Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) *Modified to Reflect Entered in Wrong Case on 7/12/2021 (MAP).
July 9, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Worth Ross Management Company Incorporated, #10 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel filed by Worth Ross Management Company Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
July 9, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Substitute Attorney for Defendants by Worth Ross Management Company Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Lines, Mark)
July 8, 2021 Filing 13 Magistrate Election Form Deadline. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall show cause in writing on or before July 25, 2021, why they should not be sanctioned or be held in contempt of court pursuant to title 18 U.S.C. 401 for failing to comply Rule 3.7(b) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. If Plaintiff complies with Rule 3.7(b) on or before July 25, 2021, by either consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction or electing to have the case assigned to a District Judge, the undersigned will automatically vacate this Order to Show Cause. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 7/8/2021. (WLP)
July 8, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Worth Ross Management Company Incorporated. (Lines, Mark)
July 8, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Edwin Lines on behalf of Worth Ross Management Company Incorporated. (Lines, Mark)
June 28, 2021 Filing 9 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that Plaintiff shall have until July 29, 2021 to file a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #6 . Defendant may file any reply within 7 days from the date Plaintiff's response is filed. The Motion shall be deemed ready for decision without oral argument on the day following the date set for filing a reply unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 6/24/2021. (REK)
June 24, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Candlewyck Condiminium Association. (Horstman, Brittney)
June 22, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Election Form Deadline. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP)
June 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittney Brooke Horstman on behalf of Candlewyck Condiminium Association. (Horstman, Brittney)
June 22, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Brittney Brooke Horstman on behalf of Defendant Candlewyck Condiminium Association. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 4, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAS)
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX229269. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z. Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-00979-PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 consent form)(BAS) Modified on 6/7/2021 to correct case number (BAS).
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number PHX229269 filed by Ronald Buttacavoli.(BAS)
June 4, 2021 Summons Issued as to Candlewyck Condiminium Association, Worth Ross Management Company Incorporated and provided to plaintiff at case opening. (BAS) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buttacavoli v. Worth Ross Management Company Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candlewyck Condiminium Association
Represented By: Brittney Brooke Horstman
Represented By: Mark Edwin Lines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Worth Ross Management Company Incorporated
Represented By: Mark Edwin Lines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Buttacavoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?