Newsome v. Dignity-Kindred Rehabilitation Hospital East Valley LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Newsome
Defendant: Unknown Parties and Dignity-Kindred Rehabilitation Hospital East Valley LLC doing business as Dignity Health East Valley Rehabilitation Hospital
Case Number: 2:2021cv00985
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John Z Boyle
Referring Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Ronald Newsome. (Bailey, Jenna)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/29/2021. (JAMA)
June 24, 2021 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT by Ronald Newsome. (Bailey, Jenna)
June 22, 2021 Filing 13 * ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand re: #1 Notice of Removal Defendants Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Dignity-Kindred Rehabilitation Hospital East Valley LLC.(Fernandez, Anthony) *Modified to correct reference to related document on 6/23/2021 (MFR).
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that counsel for the Plaintiff apply for entry of default or file a status report within seven days of the date of this Order concerning the status of this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the matter will be dismissed without further notice if counsel fails to apply for entry of default or file a status report within seven days of the date of this Order. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/21/2021. (JAMA)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/8/2021. (JAMA)
June 8, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dignity-Kindred Rehabilitation Hospital East Valley LLC. (Fernandez, Anthony)
June 8, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge John J Tuchi. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-21-00985-PHX-JJT. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 7, 2021 Filing 7 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 7, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE re: Civil Cover Sheet by Dignity-Kindred Rehabilitation Hospital East Valley LLC re: 3 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) . (Fernandez, Anthony)
June 4, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Dignity-Kindred Rehabilitation Hospital East Valley LLC. (JAM)
June 4, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Dignity-Kindred Rehabilitation Hospital East Valley LLC. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAM)
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19535402. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-985-PHX-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. PLEASE NOTE: Plaintiff(s) and defendants that have already appeared in this case are required to file the attached Magistrate Election form within FOURTEEN (14) days of this filing. Please read attached instructions. (JAM)
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2021-090703. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19535402 filed by Dignity-Kindred Rehabilitation Hospital East Valley LLC. (Fernandez, Anthony) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 State Court Record CV2021-090395)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newsome v. Dignity-Kindred Rehabilitation Hospital East Valley LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dignity-Kindred Rehabilitation Hospital East Valley LLC doing business as Dignity Health East Valley Rehabilitation Hospital
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Fernandez
Represented By: Nichole Lynn Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Newsome
Represented By: Jenna Constance Bailey
Represented By: Rebecca Stauffer
Represented By: Rebecca S Stauffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?