Ratchford et al v. Silverado Night Club LLC et al
Plaintiff: Denise Milani, Jessica Burciaga, Denise Trlica, Dessie Mitcheson, Irina Voronina, Abigail Ratchford, Eva Pepaj and Mariana Davalos
Defendant: Carbajal Enterprises LLC an Arizona limited liability company doing business as Silverado Canta Bar and Silverado Night Club LLC an Arizona limited liability company doing business as Club Silverado & Restaurant doing business as Myst Night Club doing business as Billares Night Club doing business as Delirium Night Club
Case Number: 2:2021cv01004
Filed: June 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting the parties' Stipulation #14 in that Defendant Silverado Night Club, LLC is granted an extension to file a responsive pleading to 8/30/2021. FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiff show cause by 8/18/2021 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to Defendant Carbajal Enterprises LLC, unless a responsive pleading or an application for entry of default has been filed by that date. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 7/30/2021. (KFZ)
July 30, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Silverado Night Club LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Stone, Erik)
July 30, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik John Stone on behalf of Silverado Night Club LLC. (Stone, Erik)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs show cause by 7/30/2021 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution, unless a responsive pleading or an application for entry of default has been filed by that date. FURTHER ORDERED if Plaintiff fails to comply with this order, the Clerk of Court shall dismiss this action after 7/30/2021, for Plaintiff's lack of prosecution pursuant to Rule 41(b), Fed. R. Civ. P., and LRCiv 41.1. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 7/16/2021. (KFZ)
July 14, 2021 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jessica Burciaga, Mariana Davalos, Denise Milani, Dessie Mitcheson, Eva Pepaj, Abigail Ratchford, Irina Voronina: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Exhibits upon Silverado Night Club, LLC on 6/23/2021. (Hoffman, Amy)
July 14, 2021 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jessica Burciaga, Mariana Davalos, Denise Milani, Dessie Mitcheson, Eva Pepaj, Abigail Ratchford, Irina Voronina: Declaration of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Exhibits upon Carbajal Enterprises on 6/23/2021. (Hoffman, Amy)
June 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Jessica Burciaga, Mariana Davalos, Denise Milani, Dessie Mitcheson, Eva Pepaj, Abigail Ratchford, Irina Voronina. (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(Casas, Joseph)
June 14, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for John V Golaszewski, Joseph N Casas on behalf of Plaintiffs Jessica Burciaga, Mariana Davalos, Denise Milani, Dessie Mitcheson, Eva Pepaj, Abigail Ratchford, Irina Voronina. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m). IT IS ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 9/9/2021. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 6/10/2021. (KFZ)
June 9, 2021 Filing 7 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint automated civil cover sheet by Plaintiffs Jessica Burciaga, Mariana Davalos, Denise Milani, Dessie Mitcheson, Eva Pepaj, Abigail Ratchford, Irina Voronina. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hoffman, Amy)
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(MCO)
June 9, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Carbajal Enterprises LLC, Silverado Night Club LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Denise Milani, Abigail Ratchford, Mariana Davalos, Irina Voronina, Eva Pepaj, Jessica Burciaga, Dessie Mitcheson. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
June 9, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19550707. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1004-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
June 9, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Jessica Burciaga, Mariana Davalos, Denise Milani, Dessie Mitcheson, Eva Pepaj, Abigail Ratchford, Irina Voronina. (Hoffman, Amy) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MCO)
June 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19550707 filed by Jessica Burciaga, Dessie Mitcheson, Mariana Davalos, Denise Milani, Eva Pepaj, Abigail Ratchford, Irina Voronina. (Hoffman, Amy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ratchford et al v. Silverado Night Club LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Milani
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Burciaga
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Trlica
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dessie Mitcheson
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irina Voronina
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abigail Ratchford
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Pepaj
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariana Davalos
Represented By: Joseph N Casas
Represented By: John V Golaszewski
Represented By: Amy Marie Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carbajal Enterprises LLC an Arizona limited liability company doing business as Silverado Canta Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silverado Night Club LLC an Arizona limited liability company doing business as Club Silverado & Restaurant doing business as Myst Night Club doing business as Billares Night Club doing business as Delirium Night Club
Represented By: Erik John Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?