Bui v. Bethany Crest Cooperative Corporation No. 5 et al
Plaintiff: Elisabeth Bui
Defendant: Ralph Caswell, Stella Gonzalez, Margaret Vittoria and Bethany Crest Cooperative Corporation No. 5
Case Number: 2:2021cv01046
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Filing 10 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Elisabeth Bui: Return of Service re: complaint, exhibits, summons upon Margaret Vittoria on June 29, 2021. (Tate, Elizabeth) *Modified service date on 8/3/2021 (MHW).
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting the Stipulation to Extend Answer Deadline (Doc. #8 ). The deadline for Defendant Margaret Vittoria to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is extended to 8/30/2021. There will be no further extensions absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 7/13/2021. (RMW)
July 13, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Margaret Vittoria. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order RE Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Response to the Complaint)(Van Vranken, Ember)
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ember Ann Van Vranken on behalf of Margaret Vittoria. (Van Vranken, Ember)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting the Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. #5 ). The deadline for Defendants Bethany Crest Cooperative Corp. No. 5, Ralph Caswell, and Stella Gonzalez to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is extended to 8/30/2021. There will be no further extensions absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 7/13/2021. (RMW)
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint First Request by Bethany Crest Cooperative Corporation No. 5, Ralph Caswell, Stella Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Re: Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Mear, Richard)
June 16, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bethany Crest Cooperative Corporation No. 5, Ralph Caswell, Stella Gonzalez, Margaret Vittoria. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 16, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19572616. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1046-PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Elisabeth Bui. (Tate, Elizabeth) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(JAM)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19572616 filed by Elisabeth Bui. (Tate, Elizabeth) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bui v. Bethany Crest Cooperative Corporation No. 5 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elisabeth Bui
Represented By: Elizabeth Diane Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Caswell
Represented By: Richard Wayne Mear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stella Gonzalez
Represented By: Richard Wayne Mear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Vittoria
Represented By: Ember Ann Van Vranken
Represented By: Erin Elizabeth McManis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethany Crest Cooperative Corporation No. 5
Represented By: Richard Wayne Mear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?