Pick-Up Pools Incorporated v. Bestway (USA) Incorporated
Plaintiff: Pick-Up Pools Incorporated
Defendant: Bestway (USA) Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv01056
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that the #14 Motion for Extension of Time is granted. Defendant Bestway (USA), Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Pick-Up Pools Inc.'s Complaint on or before 8/16/2021. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 6/29/2021. (ESG)
June 29, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer of Bestway (USA), Inc. by Pick-Up Pools Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Ray)
June 29, 2021 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Pick-Up Pools Incorporated: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 06/29/2021 to Bestway (USA), Inc. . (Harris, Ray)
June 22, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Christian Cowart, Darin M Klemchuk on behalf of Plaintiff Pick-Up Pools Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on September 15, 2021. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 6/21/2021. (ESG)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 6/21/2021. (ESG)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 6/21/2021. (ESG)
June 17, 2021 Filing 9 *NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Pick-Up Pools Incorporated. (Harris, Ray) *Modified to correct event and text on 6/21/2021 (REK).
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susan M Brnovich for all further proceedings. Judge Dominic W Lanza no longer assigned to case. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV 21-01056-PHX-SMB, Judge Susan M Brnovich added. Judge Dominic W Lanza no longer assigned to case. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 06/17/2021. (MHW)
June 17, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Bestway (USA) Incorporated. (MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Pick-Up Pools Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
June 17, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(MCO)
June 17, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19578364. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1056-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
June 17, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Pick-Up Pools Incorporated. (Harris, Ray) (MCO)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pick-Up Pools Incorporated. (Harris, Ray) (MCO)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19578364 filed by Pick-Up Pools Incorporated. (Harris, Ray) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pick-Up Pools Incorporated v. Bestway (USA) Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pick-Up Pools Incorporated
Represented By: Darin M Klemchuk
Represented By: Ray Kendall Harris
Represented By: Mario Carmelo Vasta
Represented By: Christian Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bestway (USA) Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?