Flury v. Marriott International Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Rosaura N Flury
Defendant: Unite Here Local 11, Unite Here Local and Marriott International Incorporated a foreign corporation doing business as Sheraton Phoenix Downtown Hotel
Case Number: 2:2021cv01068
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Unopposed #14 Motion for Extension of Time is granted. The deadline for Plaintiff to respond to the pending motion to dismiss (Doc. #12 ) is extended to August 27, 2021. Ordered by Judge Dominic W. Lanza. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ESG)
August 16, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject-Matter) and Failure to State a Claim by Rosaura N Flury. (SST) (3 pages)
July 29, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service re: #4 Preliminary Order by Rosaura N Flury. (2 pages) (ESG)
July 29, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject-Matter) and Failure to State a Claim by Marriott International Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Soveranez, Elizabeth)
July 12, 2021 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Marriott International Incorporated filed by Rosaura N Flury. (SST) (46 pages)
July 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading (First Amended Complaint) pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Rosaura N Flury. (SST) (12 pages)
July 12, 2021 Filing 9 *WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re: #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Unite Here Local 11. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Enoch, Nicholas) *Modified to reflect correct event; attorney noticed on 7/13/2021 (SST).
July 9, 2021 Filing 8 *First MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint by Unite Here Local 11. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Enoch, Nicholas) *Modified to reflect correct motion event and to add linkage; attorney noticed on 7/12/2021 (SST).
July 6, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Jason Enoch on behalf of Unite Here Local 11. (Enoch, Nicholas)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant (s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on September 21, 2021, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 6/25/21. (MAW)
June 24, 2021 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Rosaura N Flury: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Unite Here Local 11 on 6/21/21. (SST)
June 24, 2021 Filing 5 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Rosaura N Flury: Proof of Service re: Summons upon CT Corporation System (for Marriott International Incorporated) on 6/21/21. (SST)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAS)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX229659. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W. Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-01068-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAS)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number PHX229659 filed by Rosaura N Flury. (Attachments: #1 exhibits)(BAS)
June 21, 2021 Summons Issued as to Marriott International Incorporated, Unite Here Local 11 and provided to plaintiff's representative at case opening at counter. (BAS) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flury v. Marriott International Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unite Here Local 11
Represented By: Bruce Campbell Jackson, Jr.
Represented By: Clara Stephanie Acosta
Represented By: Nicholas Jason Enoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unite Here Local
Represented By: Bruce Campbell Jackson, Jr.
Represented By: Clara Stephanie Acosta
Represented By: Nicholas Jason Enoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International Incorporated a foreign corporation doing business as Sheraton Phoenix Downtown Hotel
Represented By: Elizabeth Mary Soveranez
Represented By: Thomas Michael Stanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosaura N Flury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?