2591028 Ontario Limited v. Vector Technology Systems LLC et al
Plaintiff: 2591028 Ontario Limited a foreign corporation doing business as Focus Global
Defendant: Mark Cohn, Unknown Cohn, Unknow Parties and Vector Technology Systems LLC an Arizona limited liability company doing business as Vector Technology Systems and Custom Glass and Synthetic Design LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01090
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Set Aside Default MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Mark Cohn, Vector Technology Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Forms 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Bendor, Joshua)
August 6, 2021 Filing 20 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Vector Technology Systems LLC, Mark Cohn, Unknown Cohn. (WLP)
August 5, 2021 Filing 19 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff 2591028 Ontario Limited against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support of Application)(Shoaf, John)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff must show cause in writing why this action should not be dismissed in its entirety for failure to prosecute no later than 8/6/2021, unless a responsive pleading pursuant to Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or an application for entry of default pursuant to Rule 55(a) is filed within such time. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 7/29/2021. (RMW)
July 19, 2021 Filing 17 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by 2591028 Ontario Limited: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Preliminary Order upon Vector Technology Systems, dba Vector Technology, Custom Glass and Synthetic Design on 07/01/2021. (Shoaf, John)
July 19, 2021 Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by 2591028 Ontario Limited: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Preliminary Order upon Mark Cohn, individually on 07/01/2021. (Shoaf, John)
July 19, 2021 Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by 2591028 Ontario Limited: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Preliminary Order upon Jane Doe Cohn (Susan) on 07/01/2021. (Shoaf, John)
July 19, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE re: of Service of Preliminary Order by 2591028 Ontario Limited re: #9 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions, Set Deadlines . (Shoaf, John)
June 28, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Unknown Cohn. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 25, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Submitted by 2591028 Ontario Limited. (Shoaf, John)
June 25, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #7 Summons Submitted filed by 2591028 Ontario Limited. Defendant name on summons does not match complaint. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 25, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Mark Cohn. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motion to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on September 21, 2021, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 6/24/2021. (LMR)
June 24, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Submitted by 2591028 Ontario Limited. (Shoaf, John)
June 24, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Submitted by 2591028 Ontario Limited. (Shoaf, John)
June 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #3 Summons Submitted filed by 2591028 Ontario Limited. Unable to issue summons for Mark Cohn and Jane Doe Cohn. Please list one defendant per summons. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC)
June 24, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Vector Technology Systems LLC. (ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 23, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19596795. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1090-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by 2591028 Ontario Limited. (Shoaf, John) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ARC)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 2591028 Ontario Limited. (Shoaf, John) (ARC)
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19596795 filed by 2591028 Ontario Limited. (Shoaf, John) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 2591028 Ontario Limited v. Vector Technology Systems LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Cohn
Represented By: Joshua David R Bendor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknow Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vector Technology Systems LLC an Arizona limited liability company doing business as Vector Technology Systems and Custom Glass and Synthetic Design LLC
Represented By: Joshua David R Bendor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2591028 Ontario Limited a foreign corporation doing business as Focus Global
Represented By: Andreas Daniel Coumides
Represented By: John Taylor Barnes Shoaf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?