Bloom Master Fund I LLC v. Capna Intellectual Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Bloom Master Fund I LLC
Defendant: Capna Intellectual Incorporated and Tierra Grow Management LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01116
Filed: June 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Filing 25 Acknowledgement of Receipt of Remand by Maricopa County Superior Court. (MHW)
July 8, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Capna Intellectual Incorporated. (Mandel, Robert)
July 6, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE re: Notice that Form AO 120 is not Required for Plaintiff's Verified Complaint or First Amended Verified Complaint by Bloom Master Fund I LLC re: #16 Minute Order, Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information . (Covault, Jason)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order with Notice and for a Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #2 ) is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating the Telephonic Hearing set for July 6, 2021. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall remand this matter to Maricopa County Superior Court. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 07/02/2021. (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter)(MHW)
July 2, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE re: Notice of Filing Exhibits by Bloom Master Fund I LLC re: #20 Reply . (Covault, Jason)
July 2, 2021 Filing 20 REPLY re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Bloom Master Fund I LLC, Counter Defendant Bloom Master Fund I LLC. (Covault, Jason)
July 2, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Bloom Master Fund I LLC . (Covault, Jason)
July 2, 2021 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT Verified First Amended Complaint against Capna Intellectual Incorporated, Tierra Grow Management LLC filed by Bloom Master Fund I LLC.(Covault, Jason)
July 2, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bloom Master Fund I LLC. (Covault, Jason)
July 1, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #11 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header (REK)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/30/2021. (LFIG)
July 1, 2021 Filing 14 Joinder re: #13 Response in Opposition to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Defendant Tierra Grow Management LLC. (Williams, David)
July 1, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by Capna Intellectual Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vitaly Mekk, #2 Exhibit 1 - Trademark Certificate, #3 Exhibit 2 - Trademark Assignment, #4 Exhibit 3 - Section 8 Filing, #5 Exhibit 4 - Section 8 Notice of Acceptance, #6 Exhibit 5 - Trademark Status, #7 Exhibit 6 - Press Release, #8 Exhibit 7 - Arizona BLOOM Trademark Registration, #9 Declaration of Joshua M. Masur, #10 Exhibit 8 - Letter, #11 Exhibit 9 - Arizona bloom Trademark Registrations, #12 Declaration of Steven Richard)(Mandel, Robert)
July 1, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capna Intellectual Incorporated. (Mandel, Robert)
June 30, 2021 Filing 11 Defendant Capna Intellectual's ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Bloom Master Fund I LLC by Capna Intellectual Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Errata Exhibit 3)(Mandel, Robert)
June 29, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(MYE)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. #2 ). IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall respond by no later than 7/1/2021, at 12:00 PM noon. Plaintiff may file a reply no later than 7/2/2021, at 12:00 PM noon. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting a Telephonic Hearing for 7/6/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Participating counsel shall connect five (5) minutes prior to the hearing by dialing 1-866-390-1828, and entering access code 7618428, when prompted. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/28/2021. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
June 28, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tierra Grow Management LLC. (Williams, David)
June 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: Document not in compliance with LRCiv 3.6(d). FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please file a "Notice" of Pending Motion. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MYE)
June 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David Wendell Williams on behalf of Tierra Grow Management LLC. (Williams, David)
June 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Bloom Master Fund I LLC. (MYE)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Capna Intellectual Incorporated, Tierra Grow Management LLC. (MYE)
June 28, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Brian J Beck, Joshua Michael Masur on behalf of Defendant Capna Intellectual Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 27, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19607411. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1116-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
June 27, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, and MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Bloom Master Fund I LLC. (Covault, Jason) (MYE)
June 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2021-010019. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19607411 filed by Tierra Grow Management LLC, Capna Intellectual Incorporated. (Mandel, Robert) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Superior Court Docket, #4 Exhibit Operative Complaint, #5 Exhibit Superior Court Service Document, #6 Exhibit Answers (none), #7 Exhibit Superior Court Orders of Termination or Dismissal (none), #8 Exhibit Superior Court Notices of Appearance (none), #9 Exhibit Pending Motions, Responses, or Replies, #10 Exhibit Remainder of Superior Court Record, #11 Exhibit Attorney Verification)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bloom Master Fund I LLC v. Capna Intellectual Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capna Intellectual Incorporated
Represented By: Robert A Mandel
Represented By: Joshua Michael Masur
Represented By: Brian J Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tierra Grow Management LLC
Represented By: David Wendell Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bloom Master Fund I LLC
Represented By: Michelle Leslie Mozdzen
Represented By: Jason Mark Covault
Represented By: Jesse Rowley Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?