E3 Innovation Incorporated et al v. DCL Technologies Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: E3 Displays LLC and E3 Innovation Incorporated
Defendant: Michael Steward, Andrew Blum, Holly Blum, Unknown Steward, DCL Technologies Incorporated and Bobbie Jo Steward
Case Number: 2:2021cv01141
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re: #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by E3 Displays LLC, E3 Innovation Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Woodard, Joshua)
August 19, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re: #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by E3 Displays LLC, E3 Innovation Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Woodard, Joshua)
July 20, 2021 Filing 20 *MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative Change Venue by Michael Steward, Unknown Steward. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick McCormick, Esq., #2 Declaration of Michael Steward)(McCormick, Patrick) *Modified to add text on 7/21/2021 (MHW).
July 20, 2021 Filing 19 *MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative for a Transfer of Venue by Andrew Blum, Holly Blum, DCL Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Andrew Blum)(McMahon, Ryan) *Modified to add text on 7/21/2021 (MHW).
July 16, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #17 Supplement filed by DCL Technologies Incorporated, Holly Blum, Andrew Blum. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MHW)
July 16, 2021 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENT Supplement to Notice of Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Andrew Blum, Holly Blum, DCL Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Additional Affidavits of Service)(Barnes, Leo)
July 9, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Leo Kenneth Barnes, Jr on behalf of Defendants Andrew Blum, Holly Blum, DCL Technologies Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the consent motion to extend time (Doc. #13 ) is granted. The deadline for Defendants Michael Steward and Bobbie Jo Steward to respond to the complaint is extended to July 20, 2021. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/7/21. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
July 7, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE re: Service by E3 Displays LLC, E3 Innovation Incorporated re: #11 Order, Set Deadlines . (Woodard, Joshua)
July 7, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by E3 Displays LLC, E3 Innovation Incorporated. (Woodard, Joshua)
July 7, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Michael Steward, Unknown Steward. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McCormick, Patrick)
July 6, 2021 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT Consent to Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Michael Steward, Unknown Steward. (McCormick, Patrick)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant (s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on September 30, 2021, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/6/21. (MAW)
July 6, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to E3 Displays LLC, E3 Innovation Incorporated. (WLP)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the consent motion to extend time (Doc. #6 ) is granted. The deadline for Defendants DCL Technologies Inc., Andrew Blum and Holly Blum to respond to the complaint is extended to July 20, 2021. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 7/6/21. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
July 6, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by DCL Technologies Incorporated, Holly Blum, Andrew Blum. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
July 6, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Patrick McCormick on behalf of Defendants Michael Steward, Unknown Steward. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 2, 2021 Filing 7 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Notice of Removal Automated Civil Cover Sheet by Defendants Andrew Blum, Holly Blum, DCL Technologies Incorporated. (McMahon, Ryan)
July 2, 2021 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Andrew Blum, Holly Blum, DCL Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMahon, Ryan)
July 2, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DCL Technologies Incorporated. (McMahon, Ryan)
July 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to DCL Technologies Incorporated. (BAC)
July 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by E3 Displays LLC, E3 Innovation Incorporated. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile the Civil Cover Sheet in the correct format. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
July 1, 2021 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19619967. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-01141-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2021-008872. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number 0970-19619967 filed by E3 Innovation Incorporated, E3 Displays LLC. (McMahon, Ryan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Docket Information, #5 Exhibit C - Summonses, #6 Exhibit D - Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit E - Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration, #8 Exhibit F - Affidavits of Service, #9 Exhibit G - Notice of NOR, #10 Exhibit H - Declaration)(BAC)
July 1, 2021 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED: Affidavit of Service re: Civil Cover Sheet, Summons, Complaint, Exhibits A-B, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon DCL Technologies Incorporated C/O Andrew Blum; Holly Blum on 6/4/21 (original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 5/28/21). (BAC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
July 1, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Ryan J McMahon on behalf of Defendants Andrew Blum, Holly Blum, DCL Technologies Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E3 Innovation Incorporated et al v. DCL Technologies Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Steward
Represented By: Patrick McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Blum
Represented By: Ryan J McMahon
Represented By: Leo K Barnes, Jr.
Represented By: Leo Kenneth Barnes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Blum
Represented By: Ryan J McMahon
Represented By: Leo K Barnes, Jr.
Represented By: Leo Kenneth Barnes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Steward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCL Technologies Incorporated
Represented By: Ryan J McMahon
Represented By: Leo K Barnes, Jr.
Represented By: Leo Kenneth Barnes, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobbie Jo Steward
Represented By: Patrick McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E3 Displays LLC
Represented By: Audrey Elaine Chastain
Represented By: Joshua Robert Woodard
Represented By: Jennifer Rachel Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E3 Innovation Incorporated
Represented By: Audrey Elaine Chastain
Represented By: Joshua Robert Woodard
Represented By: Jennifer Rachel Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?