Cooper v. Budget Baby LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Cooper
Defendant: Alonso Popejoy-Shimchock, Budget Baby LLC, Emily Schmidt, Anthony Younan and Armored Roofing LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01148
Filed: July 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Referring Judge: Eileen S Willett
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for September 28, 2021 at 8:45 a.m. (15 minutes allowed). The parties will receive dial-in instructions for connecting to the teleconference via electronic mail prior to the hearing. See attached order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 8/13/2021. (ESG)
August 12, 2021 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Budget Baby LLC. (Holden, Helen)
August 12, 2021 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Armored Roofing LLC. (Holden, Helen)
August 12, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint by Armored Roofing LLC, Budget Baby LLC, Alonso Popejoy-Shimchock, Emily Schmidt, Anthony Younan.(Holden, Helen)
July 29, 2021 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ryan Cooper.(Kuklinski, Amanda)
July 29, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Ryan Cooper . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Kuklinski, Amanda)
July 29, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Helen Rubenstein Holden on behalf of Armored Roofing LLC, Budget Baby LLC, Alonso Popejoy-Shimchock, Emily Schmidt, Anthony Younan. (Holden, Helen)
July 12, 2021 Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ryan Cooper : Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: COMPLAINT; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; PRELIMINARY ORDER upon Emily Schmidt on 21.07.09. (Kuklinski, Amanda)
July 12, 2021 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ryan Cooper : Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: COMPLAINT; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; PRELIMINARY ORDER upon Budget Baby on 21.07.09. (Kuklinski, Amanda)
July 12, 2021 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ryan Cooper : Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: COMPLAINT; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; PRELIMINARY ORDER upon Armored Roofing on 21.07.09. (Kuklinski, Amanda)
July 12, 2021 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ryan Cooper : Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: COMPLAINT; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; PRELIMINARY ORDER upon Anthony Younan on 21.07.09. (Kuklinski, Amanda)
July 12, 2021 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ryan Cooper : Proof of Service re: SUMMONS are: COMPLAINT; NOTICE, CONSENT, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE-EXERCISE OF JURISDICTION BY A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE; PRELIMINARY ORDER upon Alonso Shimchock on 21.07.09. (Kuklinski, Amanda)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on September 29, 2021. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 7/06/2021. (ESG)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 7/06/2021. (ESG)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 7/6/2021. (ESG)
July 6, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan M Brnovich. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-21-1148-PHX-SMB. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 2, 2021 Filing 6 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 1, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Armored Roofing LLC, Budget Baby LLC, Alonso Popejoy-Shimchock, Emily Schmidt, and Anthony Younan. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 1, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19625985. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1148-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. (DLC)
July 1, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Ryan Cooper. (Kuklinski, Amanda) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(DLC)
July 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19625985 filed by Ryan Cooper. (Kuklinski, Amanda) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Budget Baby LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Cooper
Represented By: Amanda Michelle Kuklinski
Represented By: Jason Saul Barrat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alonso Popejoy-Shimchock
Represented By: Helen Rubenstein Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Budget Baby LLC
Represented By: Helen Rubenstein Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Schmidt
Represented By: Helen Rubenstein Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Younan
Represented By: Helen Rubenstein Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armored Roofing LLC
Represented By: Helen Rubenstein Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?