Paragon Technology & Development Incorporated et al v. Lunny et al
Plaintiff: Paragon Technology & Development Incorporated and Gatsby Enterprises Incorporated
Defendant: Robert Lunny, Victoria Barrett and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2021cv01177
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jared C Xu on behalf of Plaintiffs Gatsby Enterprises Incorporated, Paragon Technology & Development Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 27, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Farhad Novian on behalf of Plaintiffs Gatsby Enterprises Incorporated, Paragon Technology & Development Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 20, 2021 Remark: Out of state attorneys Farhad Novian and Jared C Xu terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on October 6, 2021. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/8/2021. (JAMA)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/8/2021. (JAMA)
July 8, 2021 Filing 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint, 7 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiffs Gatsby Enterprises Incorporated, Paragon Technology & Development Incorporated. (Windtberg, Marc)
July 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Paragon Technology & Development Incorporated, Gatsby Enterprises Incorporated. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please file the automated Civil Cover Sheet. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Victoria Barrett, Robert Lunny. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ARC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19643419. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1177-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ARC)
July 7, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Gatsby Enterprises Incorporated, Paragon Technology & Development Incorporated. (Windtberg, Marc) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ARC)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paragon Technology & Development Incorporated. (Windtberg, Marc) (ARC)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gatsby Enterprises Incorporated. (Windtberg, Marc) (ARC)
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19643419 filed by Paragon Technology & Development Incorporated, Gatsby Enterprises Incorporated. (Windtberg, Marc)(ARC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paragon Technology & Development Incorporated et al v. Lunny et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paragon Technology & Development Incorporated
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Jared C Xu
Represented By: Marc Steven Windtberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gatsby Enterprises Incorporated
Represented By: Farhad Novian
Represented By: Jared C Xu
Represented By: Marc Steven Windtberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lunny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?