Ziglar v. United States Postal Service
Plaintiff: Christerphor Ziglar
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Case Number: 2:2021cv01223
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/03/2021. (REK)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on October 13, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/13/2021. (REK)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Plaintiff's application #2 . Plaintiff shall be responsible for service of the summons and complaint. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/03/2021. (REK)
July 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (SMH)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1223-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SMH)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Christerphor Ziglar. (SMH)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Christerphor Ziglar. (SMH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ziglar v. United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christerphor Ziglar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?