Corner v. Brothers and Keepers Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Dustin Corner
Defendant: Brothers and Keepers Corporation, Brothers and Keepers Group Home LLC, Keith Brown, Dominique Brown, Anthony Misner and Unknown Misner
Case Number: 2:2021cv01273
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brothers and Keepers Corporation, Brothers and Keepers Group Home LLC, Dominique Brown, Keith Brown, Anthony Misner, Unknown Misner. (DuPree, Whitney)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 11/2/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/31/2021. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
August 31, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Brothers and Keepers Corporation, Brothers and Keepers Group Home LLC. (LFIG)
August 31, 2021 Filing 9 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Brothers and Keepers Corporation, Brothers and Keepers Group Home LLC, Dominique Brown, Keith Brown, Anthony Misner, Unknown Misner.(DuPree, Whitney)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: For good cause showing, IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' unopposed First Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (Doc. #7 ) is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than August 31, 2021. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/17/2021. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Brothers and Keepers Corporation, Brothers and Keepers Group Home LLC, Dominique Brown, Keith Brown, Anthony Misner, Unknown Misner. (DuPree, Whitney)
August 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Whitney Michelle DuPree on behalf of Brothers and Keepers Corporation, Brothers and Keepers Group Home LLC, Dominique Brown, Keith Brown. (DuPree, Whitney)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/26/2021. (LFIG)
July 23, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Brothers and Keepers Corporation, Brothers and Keepers Group Home LLC, Dominique Brown, Keith Brown, Anthony Misner, Unknown Misner. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19693475. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1273-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
July 22, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Dustin Corner. (Bendau, Christopher) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(JAM)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19693475 filed by Dustin Corner. (Bendau, Christopher) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corner v. Brothers and Keepers Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Corner
Represented By: Christopher Jacob Bendau
Represented By: Clifford Phillip Bendau, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brothers and Keepers Corporation
Represented By: Whitney Michelle DuPree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brothers and Keepers Group Home LLC
Represented By: Whitney Michelle DuPree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Brown
Represented By: Whitney Michelle DuPree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominique Brown
Represented By: Whitney Michelle DuPree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Misner
Represented By: Whitney Michelle DuPree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Misner
Represented By: Whitney Michelle DuPree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?