State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Watts Water Technologies Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: Watts Water Technologies Incorporated and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2021cv01304
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Amy Michelle Samberg. (Samberg, Amy)
August 12, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Kevin R Sutherland on behalf of Defendant Watts Water Technologies Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 11, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Moulton, Timothy)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting a Telephonic Pretrial Scheduling Conference for 10/7/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/9/2021. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
August 9, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Watts Water Technologies Incorporated. (Samberg, Amy)
August 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Watts Water Technologies Incorporated. (WLP)
August 6, 2021 Filing 7 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Watts Water Technologies Incorporated. (Samberg, Amy)
August 6, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Watts Water Technologies Incorporated.(Samberg, Amy)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/29/2021. (JAMA)
July 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (JAM)
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19707464. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1304-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Watts Water Technologies Incorporated. (Samberg, Amy) (JAM)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2021-009709. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19707464 filed by Watts Water Technologies Incorporated. (Samberg, Amy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(JAM)
July 28, 2021 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Demand for Jury Trial, Certificate re Compulsory Arbitration upon Watts Water Technologies, Inc. on 6/28/21. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 7/8/21.) (JAM) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Watts Water Technologies Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Timothy Lee Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watts Water Technologies Incorporated
Represented By: Amy Michelle Samberg
Represented By: Kevin R Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?