Tapia v. Cook Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Charidy Tapia
Defendant: Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Group Incorporated and Cook Medical LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01316
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michelle H Burns
Referring Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-159) Transferring Case to Southern District of Indiana Re MDL-2570. (MAP)
August 31, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Southern District of Indiana via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 31, 2021 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Electronic Transfer in the Southern District of Indiana. New Case Number: 1:21-cv-06573. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/23/2021. (JAMA)
August 23, 2021 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge John J Tuchi. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-21-1316-PHX-JJT. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 20, 2021 Filing 10 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 11, 2021 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Charidy Tapia: Certificate of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Cook Medical LLC on 08/09/2021. (Stoller, Paul)
August 11, 2021 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Charidy Tapia: Certificate of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Cook Group Incorporated on 08/09/2021. (Stoller, Paul)
August 11, 2021 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Charidy Tapia: Certificate of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Cook Medical Incorporated on 08/09/2021. (Stoller, Paul)
August 11, 2021 Filing 5 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Charidy Tapia: Certificate of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Cook Incorporated on 08/09/2021. (Stoller, Paul)
July 29, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(REM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19712109. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H. Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-01316-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. (REM)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Charidy Tapia. (Stoller, Paul) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(REM)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19712109 filed by Charidy Tapia.(Stoller, Paul) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tapia v. Cook Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charidy Tapia
Represented By: Jennifer Cummins Rethemeier
Represented By: Paul Lincoln Stoller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?