Weintraub v. JP Morgan Chase Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Victor H Weintraub
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank National Association and JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Case Number: 2:2021cv01336
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Pursuant to the Court's order staying deadlines in this matter, (Doc. #14 ), IT IS ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference presently set for 9/23/2021 is VACATED. Ordered by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 9/14/2021. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall, without further notice, dismiss this entire case on 10/8/2021, with prejudice, unless prior thereto a party withdraws the Notice of Settlement (Doc. #13 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any pending deadlines in this matter are stayed. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 9/8/2021. (RMW)
September 8, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Noe, Sarah)
August 25, 2021 Filing 12 PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Victor H Weintraub. (SMH)
August 24, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (Noe, Sarah)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for Thursday, 9/23/2021 at 11:00 AM, in Courtroom 503. The parties must jointly file the Joint Proposed Case Management Report with the Clerk of the Court at least 10 days before the Scheduling Conference. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 8/17/2021. (RMW)
August 17, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Joel Edward Tasca on behalf of Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 17, 2021 Remark: Out of state attorney Joel Edward Tasca terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 13, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA.(Noe, Sarah)
August 10, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to the McDowell Mountain Justice Court, Maricopa County-Small Claims Division by Victor H Weintraub. (MHW)
August 10, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JP Morgan Chase Bank National Association. (Noe, Sarah)
August 2, 2021 Filing 6 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Notice of Removal, 5 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) // Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank National Association. (Noe, Sarah)
August 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank National Association. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAM)
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to JP Morgan Chase Bank National Association. (JAM)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (JAM)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19720859. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1336-PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from McDowell Mountain Justice Court, case number CC2021-105156SC. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19720859 filed by JP Morgan Chase Bank National Association. (Noe, Sarah) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weintraub v. JP Morgan Chase Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor H Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank National Association
Represented By: Joel Edward Tasca
Represented By: Sarah Ann Noe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Joel Edward Tasca
Represented By: Sarah Ann Noe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?