Wareka v. Dillaway et al
Plaintiff: Tamara Wareka and Tamara Williams
Defendant: Paul Dillaway and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2021cv01372
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paul Dillaway. (Stone, Erik)
October 4, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Paul Dillaway.(Stone, Erik)
September 22, 2021 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Tamara Wareka: Return of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Exhibits and Order upon Paul Dillaway on 9/12/2021. (Higbee, Melissa)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED if any Defendants file a motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) or 12(c) and if Plaintiff contends any further amendment of her Complaint (Doc. 1) can cure any alleged deficiency, Plaintiff must submit, no later than the time she files a response to a motion to dismiss, a proposed amended complaint containing all further allegations Plaintiff could make. FURTHER ORDERED that, in the event a motion to dismiss is granted in any part, no leave will be granted to amend the Complaint beyond what is offered in that proposed amended complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/6/2021. (KFZ)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m). IT IS ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 11/5/2021. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/6/2021. (KFZ)
August 6, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Tamara Wareka, #1 Complaint filed by Tamara Wareka. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MYE)
August 6, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Paul Dillaway. (MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Tamara Wareka. (Higbee, Melissa) (MYE)
August 6, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(MYE)
August 6, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19742228. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1372-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Tamara Wareka. (Higbee, Melissa) (MYE)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tamara Wareka. (Higbee, Melissa) (MYE)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19742228 filed by Tamara Wareka. (Higbee, Melissa) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-E)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wareka v. Dillaway et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Wareka
Represented By: Melissa Ann Higbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Williams
Represented By: Melissa Ann Higbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Dillaway
Represented By: Erik John Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?