Offerpad LLC et al v. Harvey et al
Plaintiff: Offerpad LLC and Offerpad Incorporated
Defendant: Brian Daniel Harvey, Mary Gabrielle Harvey and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2021cv01375
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice #16 , with each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall close this case. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 10/5/21. (SJF)
October 5, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Offerpad Incorporated, Offerpad LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kapteyn, Jeremy)
October 5, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Offerpad Incorporated, Offerpad LLC. (Kapteyn, Jeremy)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that Plaintiff shall file the required forms by October 12, 2021. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 10/4/21. (SJF)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall, without further notice, dismiss this entire case on 10/28/2021, with prejudice, unless prior thereto a party withdraws the Notice of Settlement (Doc. #12 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any pending deadlines in this matter are stayed. Signed by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 9/28/2021. (RMW)
September 28, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement by Offerpad Incorporated, Offerpad LLC. (Kapteyn, Jeremy)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED granting the Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint (Doc. #10 ). The deadline for Defendants to file their Answer is October 5, 2021. There will be no further extensions absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. ORDERED by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 9/2/2021. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
September 1, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint Extending Deadline to Respond to the Complaint from September 7, 2021 to October 5, 2021 by Brian Daniel Harvey, Mary Gabrielle Harvey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Medical Documentation Concerning Defendants' Counsel Justifying Extension, #2 Proposed Order)(Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth)
September 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Michael Motolenich-Salas on behalf of Brian Daniel Harvey, Mary Gabrielle Harvey. (Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth)
August 11, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Brian Daniel Harvey, Mary Gabrielle Harvey. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 10, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Submitted by Offerpad Incorporated, Offerpad LLC. (Hayden, Jefferson)
August 10, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by Offerpad Incorporated, Offerpad LLC. (Hayden, Jefferson)
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(JAM)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19742839. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1375-PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Offerpad LLC. (JAM)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Offerpad Incorporated. (JAM)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19742839 filed by Offerpad LLC, Offerpad Incorporated. (Hayden, Jefferson) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-8)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Offerpad LLC et al v. Harvey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Offerpad LLC
Represented By: Garrett A Nebeker-Hay
Represented By: Jefferson Richard Hayden
Represented By: Jeremy Kapteyn
Represented By: Mark W Williams
Represented By: Nicholas Kirby
Represented By: Garrett Albert Nebeker-Hay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Offerpad Incorporated
Represented By: Garrett A Nebeker-Hay
Represented By: Jefferson Richard Hayden
Represented By: Jeremy Kapteyn
Represented By: Mark W Williams
Represented By: Nicholas Kirby
Represented By: Garrett Albert Nebeker-Hay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Daniel Harvey
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Motolenich-Salas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Gabrielle Harvey
Represented By: Kenneth Michael Motolenich-Salas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?