Updike v. American Honda Motor Company Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Steven Updike
Defendant: American Honda Motor Company Incorporated and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2021cv01379
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by American Honda Motor Company Incorporated.(Lundmark, David)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 10/19/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/10/2021. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/10/2021. (LFIG)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19748404. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1379-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Honda Motor Company Incorporated. (Cereghini, Paul) (MYE)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2021-007130. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19748404 filed by American Honda Motor Company Incorporated. (Cereghini, Paul) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Civil Cover Sheet & B-Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit C-E)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Updike v. American Honda Motor Company Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Updike
Represented By: Jorge Franco
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Brophy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Honda Motor Company Incorporated
Represented By: David T Lundmark
Represented By: Paul G Cereghini
Represented By: William Francis Auther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?