Spectrum Products LLC v. Gao et al
Plaintiff: Spectrum Products LLC
Defendant: Jie Gao, Jie Hue and Ventilaiders
Case Number: 2:2021cv01407
Filed: August 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #18 Spectrum's application for an asset-freezing TRO. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 9/3/2021. (RMV)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 *MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Spectrum Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order)(Brown, Nathanael) *Modified to remove ex parte designation on 9/3/2021 (MFR).
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Ventilaiders. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Spectrum Products LLC. (Brown, Nathanael)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Submitted by Spectrum Products LLC. (Brown, Nathanael)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #10 Summons Submitted filed by Spectrum Products LLC. defendant name does not match complaint. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Jie Gao, Jie Hue. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Spectrum Products LLC. (Brown, Nathanael)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Spectrum Products LLC. (Brown, Nathanael) *Modified to indicate incomplete form, attorney noticed on 8/24/2021 (LAD).
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Submitted by Spectrum Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Jie Gao, #2 Summons Jie Hue)(Brown, Nathanael)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - The parties are advised, pursuant to LRCiv 12.1(c), that motions to dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) and motions for judgment on the pleadings under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(c) are discouraged if the defect(s) in the complaint can be cured by a permissible amendment. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/16/2021. (WLP)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that Plaintiff's application for a temporary restraining order (Doc. #2 ) is DENIED without prejudice. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/16/2021. (RMV)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(MYE)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Spectrum Products LLC. (MYE)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #3 Summons Submitted filed by Spectrum Products LLC. Clerk is unable to issue summons. Summons submitted with more than one defendant listed. Summons missing complete attorney information. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document with one defendant per summons and complete attorney's name and address information. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MYE)
August 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19766930. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1407-PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
August 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Spectrum Products LLC. (Brown, Nathanael) (MYE)
August 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Spectrum Products LLC. (Brown, Nathanael) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(MYE)
August 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19766930 filed by Spectrum Products LLC. (Brown, Nathanael) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spectrum Products LLC v. Gao et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spectrum Products LLC
Represented By: Nathanael Melvin Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jie Gao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jie Hue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ventilaiders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?