McKesson Medical-Surgical Incorporated v. Custom Glass and Synthetic Design LLC
Plaintiff: McKesson Medical-Surgical Incorporated
Defendant: Custom Glass and Synthetic Design LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01471
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT - Pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and upon application by the Plaintiff, default is hereby entered against Defendant Custom Glass and Synthetic Design LLC. (LAD)
October 4, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Nancy K. Swift re: #8 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Custom Glass and Synthetic Design, LLC Request for Entry of Default Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff McKesson Medical-Surgical Incorporated. (Swift, Nancy)
October 4, 2021 Filing 8 *APPLICATION for Entry of Default as to Custom Glass and Synthetic Design, LLC Request for Entry of Default by McKesson Medical-Surgical Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of Nancy K. Swift In Support of Request for Entry of Default, #2 Attachment Certificate of Default)(Swift, Nancy) *Modified to correct event, attorney noticed on 10/5/2021 (LAD).
September 15, 2021 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by McKesson Medical-Surgical Incorporated: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Order, Civil Cover Sheet, Plaintiff's Disclosure Statement and Notice of Availability Magistrate Judge Exercise Jurisdiction upon Custom Glass and Synthetic Design, LLC on August 31, 2021. (Swift, Nancy)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/25/2021. (CLB)
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Custom Glass and Synthetic Design LLC. (JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19800781. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1471-PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by McKesson Medical-Surgical Incorporated. (Swift, Nancy) (JAM)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McKesson Medical-Surgical Incorporated. (JAM)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19800781 filed by McKesson Medical-Surgical Incorporated. (Swift, Nancy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKesson Medical-Surgical Incorporated v. Custom Glass and Synthetic Design LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McKesson Medical-Surgical Incorporated
Represented By: Nancy Kalafa Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Custom Glass and Synthetic Design LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?