Davenport v. Spellbinders Paper Arts Company LLC
Plaintiff: Jane Davenport
Defendant: Spellbinders Paper Arts Company LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01482
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jane Davenport: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 09/03/2021 to Spellbinders Paper Arts Co, LLC . (Breit, Michelle)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED if Defendant files a motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) or 12(c) and if Plaintiff contends any further amendment of her Complaint #1 can cure any alleged deficiency, Plaintiff must submit, no later than the time she files a response to a motion to dismiss, a proposed amended complaint containing all further allegations Plaintiff could make. FURTHER ORDERED that, in the event a motion to dismiss is granted in any part, no leave will be granted to amend the Complaint beyond what is offered in that proposed amended complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant and file notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/30/2021. (KFZ)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m). IT IS ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 11/29/2021. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/30/2021. (KFZ)
August 27, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Spellbinders Paper Arts Company LLC. (JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19810810. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1482-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Jane Davenport. (Breit, Michelle) (JAM)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19810810 filed by Jane Davenport. (Breit, Michelle) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davenport v. Spellbinders Paper Arts Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Davenport
Represented By: Michelle Gail Breit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spellbinders Paper Arts Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?