KeyState Holdings LLC v. keystate.holdings
Plaintiff: KeyState Holdings LLC
Defendant: keystateholdings.com and keystate.holdings
Case Number: 2:2021cv01520
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Filing 19 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by KeyState Holdings LLC: Service by Publication on 10/15/2021 per #18 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Villanueva, Cindy) *Modified event and text on 10/19/2021 (REK).
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that Plaintiff's #17 Motion for Service by Publication is granted. See attached order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 10/06/2021. (ESG)
October 5, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Service by Publication by KeyState Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Villanueva, Cindy)
October 5, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE re: Service by Postal Mail by KeyState Holdings LLC re: 12 Time Change Only - Motion Hearing . (Villanueva, Cindy)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that pending a full trial on the merits: A. The
September 16, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan M. Brnovich: Motion Hearing held on 9/16/2021 re: Ex-Parte Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Neither defendant, nor defense counsel has appeared. IT IS ORDERED granting Plaintiff's Ex-Parte #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Formal order to follow. APPEARANCES: Cindy Villanueva for Plaintiff. (Court Reporter Christine Coaly) Hearing held 4:35 PM to 4:39 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ESG)
September 14, 2021 Filing 13 *NOTICE re: Service By Electronic Mail by KeyState Holdings LLC re: 12 Time Change Only - Motion Hearing . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Villanueva, Cindy) *Modified on 9/15/2021 to correct event type (KAH).
September 14, 2021 Filing 12 IT IS ORDERED the Motion Hearing for #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by KeyState Holdings LLC presently set for 9/16/2021 at 1:00 PM, is RESET. THIS IS A TIME CHANGE ONLY! Motion Hearing reset for 9/16/2021 at 04:30 PM (30 mins allowed) in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. KeyState may serve this Order, and all other pleadings filed to date, on the registrant by e-mail to the e-mail address currently provided in the WHOIS information associated with the
September 13, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE re: Deposit of Bond by KeyState Holdings LLC re: #9 Order, Terminate Motions, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings . (Villanueva, Cindy)
September 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE re: Service By Electronic Mail by KeyState Holdings LLC re: #9 Order, Terminate Motions, Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Villanueva, Cindy)
September 8, 2021 Filing 9 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: Upon consideration of the motion for temporary restraining order #4 : The
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on December 2, 2021. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 9/08/2021. (ESG)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 9/8/2021. (ESG)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 9/08/2021. (ESG)
September 3, 2021 Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19833880. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-01520-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
September 3, 2021 Filing 4 EX PARTE MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by KeyState Holdings LLC. (Villanueva, Cindy) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(BAC)
September 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by KeyState Holdings LLC. (Villanueva, Cindy) (BAC)
September 3, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KeyState Holdings LLC. (Villanueva, Cindy) (BAC)
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (TRO Requested). Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number 0970-19833880 filed by KeyState Holdings LLC. (Villanueva, Cindy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KeyState Holdings LLC v. keystate.holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KeyState Holdings LLC
Represented By: Cindy Aracely Villanueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: keystateholdings.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: keystate.holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?