Jimenez v. Mercy Maricopa Regional Behavioral Health of Arizona
Plaintiff: Marco Antonio Jimenez
Defendant: Mercy Maricopa Regional Behavioral Health of Arizona
Case Number: 2:2021cv01542
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1402
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to #5 Order regarding submitting the filing fee, and no filing fee payment having been received, the civil case is terminated without prejudice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk shall dismiss this action without prejudice unless by 9/27/2021, Plaintiff has paid the filing fee or submitted a signed and completed Application. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/10/21. (DXD)
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (HLA)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1542-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (HLA)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Marco Antonio Jimenez. (HLA)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Marco Antonio Jimenez.(HLA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimenez v. Mercy Maricopa Regional Behavioral Health of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Antonio Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercy Maricopa Regional Behavioral Health of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?