Cole v. Milosevic et al
Plaintiff: Lynae A Cole
Defendant: Gordana Milosevic and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv01636
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hurley, Emory)
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE re: of Substitution of United States as Defendant by United States of America . (Hurley, Emory)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/23/2021. (LFIG)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION of Scope of Employment of Godana Milosevic by United States of America. (JAM)
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (JAM)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1636-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Justice Courts, case number CC2021-137565-RC filed by United States of America. (Hurley, Emory) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment, #5 Attachment, #6 Attachment, #7 Attachment, #8 Attachment, #9 Attachment, #10 Attachment, #11 Attachment, #12 Exhibit)(JAM)
September 22, 2021 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Notice upon Gordana Milosevic RPH on 8/30/21. (Original filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts on 8/27/21.) (JAM) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. Milosevic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynae A Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordana Milosevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Emory Thomas Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?