Easton Diamond Sports LLC v. Proton Sports Incorporated
Plaintiff: Easton Diamond Sports LLC
Defendant: Proton Sports Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2021cv01655
Filed: September 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that counsel for the Plaintiff apply for entry of default or file a status report within seven days of the date of this Order concerning the status of this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the matter will be dismissed without further notice if counsel fails to apply for entry of default or file a status report within seven days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 11/17/2021. (JAMA)
October 12, 2021 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Easton Diamond Sports LLC: Affidavit of Service re: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT WITH EXHIBITS, CIVIL COVER SHEET, CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF US MAGISTRATE JUDGE, REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, ORDER upon Proton Sports, Inc. on 10/11/2021. (Williams, James)
October 6, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Evan Langdon on behalf of Plaintiff Easton Diamond Sports LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 30, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Seth D Levy on behalf of Plaintiff Easton Diamond Sports LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/27/2021. (JAMA)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on December 24, 2021. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/27/2021. (JAMA)
September 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James Lawrence Williams on behalf of Easton Diamond Sports LLC. (Williams, James)
September 27, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Easton Diamond Sports LLC. (Williams, James)
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Proton Sports Incorporated. (JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(JAM)
September 24, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19902500. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1655-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
September 24, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Easton Diamond Sports LLC. (Williams, James) (JAM)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Easton Diamond Sports LLC. (JAM)
September 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19902500 filed by Easton Diamond Sports LLC. (Williams, James) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Easton Diamond Sports LLC v. Proton Sports Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Easton Diamond Sports LLC
Represented By: Evan H Langdon
Represented By: James Lawrence Williams
Represented By: Seth D Levy
Represented By: Evan Langdon
Represented By: Lacy Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Proton Sports Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?