Morales v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Maria Lourdes Morales
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv01668
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sathya Oum appearing for Commissioner of Social Security Administration. . (Oum, Sathya)
October 7, 2021 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Maria Lourdes Morales: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon SSA/OGC on 10/4/2021. (Osterhout, Karl)
October 7, 2021 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Maria Lourdes Morales: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Attorney General on 10/4/2021. (Osterhout, Karl)
October 7, 2021 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Maria Lourdes Morales: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon U.S. Attorney on 10/4/2021. (Osterhout, Karl)
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Proposed Order)(BAS)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting the application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ), without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefor. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service of the summons and complaint. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 9/29/2021. (RMW)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER - See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/29/2021. (WLP)
September 29, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Karl E Osterhout on behalf of Plaintiff Maria Lourdes Morales. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 28, 2021 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1668-PHX-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
September 28, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Maria Lourdes Morales. (Ayodele, Elizabeth) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MYE)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Maria Lourdes Morales. (Ayodele, Elizabeth) (MYE)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Maria Lourdes Morales. (Ayodele, Elizabeth) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Lourdes Morales
Represented By: Elizabeth Oluwafunmi Ayodele
Represented By: Karl E Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Sathya Oum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?