Chaverri et al v. Platinum LED Lights LLC et al
Plaintiff: Scott Chaverri and Mito Red Light Incorporated
Defendant: Platinum LED Lights LLC, Mark Sawyer, Unknown Sawyer, Michael Volkin, Unknown Volkin, Volkinator Enterprises Incorporated and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2021cv01700
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #22 MOTION for Attorney Fees - Plaintiffs' Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees filed by Platinum LED Lights LLC, Mark Sawyer, Michael Volkin, Volkinator Enterprises Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Kelley Declaration)(Kelley, Bennet)
December 2, 2021 Filing 29 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in the Second Amended Complaint by Platinum LED Lights LLC, Mark Sawyer, Michael Volkin, Volkinator Enterprises Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Mike Volkin)(Kelley, Bennet)
November 29, 2021 Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to #7 Order, Unknown Sawyer (named as Jane Doe Sawyer) and Unknown Volkin (named as Jane Doe Volkin) terminated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that the Stipulation (Doc. #26 ) is granted. Defendants shall have until 12/2/2021 to file an answer to the Complaint and otherwise respond as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Defendants shall also have until 12/2/2021 to file a response to the Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 11/23/2021. (RMW)
November 22, 2021 Filing 26 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Platinum LED Lights LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shanker, Tamera)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AMENDED ORDER (Amending Doc. #24 ). IT IS ORDERED that the Stipulation (Doc. #23 ) is granted. Defendants shall have until 11/22/2021 to file an answer to the Complaint and otherwise respond as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Defendants shall also have until 11/22/2021 to file a response to the Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 11/18/2021. (RMW)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 AMENDED by Doc. #25 : ORDER that the Stipulation (Doc. #23 ) is granted. Defendants shall have until 11/22/2021 to file an answer to the Complaint and otherwise respond as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 11/15/2021. (RMW) Modified on 11/18/2021 (RMW).
November 15, 2021 Filing 23 *STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Platinum LED Lights LLC, Mark Sawyer, Michael Volkin, Volkinator Enterprises Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shanker, Tamera) *Modified to add additional filers on 11/16/2021 (REK).
November 5, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Attorney Fees - Plaintiffs' Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees by Scott Chaverri, Mito Red Light Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Raeesabbas Mohamed ISO Plaintiffs' Application for An Award of Attorneys' Fees, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: The Stipulation #17 is granted as follows: Plaintiff's may file a Second Amended Complaint. Defendants shall have twenty-one (21) days from the filing of the Second Amended Complaint to file an answer to the Complaint and otherwise respond as provided by Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 11/02/2021. (REK)
November 1, 2021 Filing 20 PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Scott Chaverri, Mito Red Light Incorporated. (Mohamed, Raeesabbas)
November 1, 2021 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against Platinum LED Lights LLC, Mark Sawyer, Unknown Sawyer, Michael Volkin, Unknown Volkin, Volkinator Enterprises Incorporated filed by Mito Red Light Incorporated, Scott Chaverri.(Mohamed, Raeesabbas)
November 1, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Scott Chaverri, Mito Red Light Incorporated - Notice of Filing Second Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas)
November 1, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION re: #9 Additional Attachments to Main Document, #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion to Strike - Stipulation Regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and to Extend Briefing Schedule Re: Second Amended Complaint by Scott Chaverri, Mito Red Light Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that the Motion to Strike (Doc. #14 ) is granted and the Amended Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #10 ) is stricken. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall have until 11/1/2021 to file an Answer or otherwise respond pursuant to Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and in accordance with LRCiv 12.1(c) and the Court's Preliminary Order (Doc. #7 ). See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 10/22/2021. (RMW)
October 22, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #14 MOTION to Strike #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #9 Additional Attachments to Main Document filed by Platinum LED Lights LLC, Mark Sawyer, Michael Volkin, Volkinator Enterprises Incorporated. (Kelley, Bennet) *Modified to remove duplicate text on 10/25/2021 (WLP).
October 21, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Strike #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #9 Additional Attachments to Main Document by Scott Chaverri, Mito Red Light Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Declaration of Raeesabbas Mohamed ISO Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas) *Modified to remove duplicate text on 10/22/2021 (WLP).
October 21, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Platinum LED Lights LLC, Volkinator Enterprises Incorporated. (Kelley, Bennet)
October 20, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Bennet G Kelley on behalf of Defendants Platinum LED Lights LLC, Mark Sawyer, Unknown Sawyer, Michael Volkin, Unknown Volkin, Volkinator Enterprises Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 19, 2021 Filing 12 PLAINTIFF'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Scott Chaverri, Mito Red Light Incorporated. (Mohamed, Raeesabbas)
October 19, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mito Red Light Incorporated. (Mohamed, Raeesabbas)
October 12, 2021 Filing 10 STRICKEN by Doc. #16 : *Amended MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Platinum LED Lights LLC, Mark Sawyer, Michael Volkin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shanker, Tamera) *Modified to correct motion type and add additional filers on 10/13/2021. Please Note: Appears to be a duplicate of #9 (REK). Modified on 10/22/2021 (RMW).
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 *MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Platinum LED Lights LLC, Michael Volkin, Mark Sawyer. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Volkin Declaration Executed)(Shanker, Tamera) *Modified text to reflect correct document title, event text, and add filers on 10/13/2021. Item also appears to be duplicate of #10 (REK).
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Scott Chaverri, Mito Red Light Incorporated: Affidavit of Service re: State Court Summons, First Amended Complaint and First Amended Certificate Regarding Compulsory Arbitration - Notice of Filing Affidavits of Service and Summonses- upon Defendants, Michael Volkin; Volkinator Enterprises, Inc.; Mark Sawyer; Platinum Led Lights, LLC on 09/06/21; 09/06/21; 09/10/21; 09/11/21. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mohamed, Raeesabbas)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY ORDER: The Plaintiff(s) must file proof of service of the summons and complaint or of waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than November 25, 2021. The Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on November 25, 2021, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/06/2021. (REK)
October 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Mark Sawyer, Michael Volkin, Volkinator Enterprises Incorporated, Platinum LED Lights LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAM)
October 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Mito Red Light Incorporated. (JAM)
October 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Platinum LED Lights LLC, Volkinator Enterprises Incorporated. (JAM)
October 5, 2021 Filing 3 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Platinum LED Lights LLC, Mark Sawyer, Michael Volkin, Volkinator Enterprises Incorporated: Proof of Service re: Notice of Removal; Exhibits 1-13; Civil Cover Sheet JS-44; and Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet for Cases Removed from Another Jurisdiction upon Raeesabbas Mohamed on 10/5/21. (Shanker, Tamera) (JAM)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19936325. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1700-PHX-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2021-008044. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19936325 filed by Volkinator Enterprises Incorporated, Michael Volkin, Mark Sawyer, Platinum LED Lights LLC. (Shanker, Tamera) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(JAM)
October 5, 2021 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service re: Summons, First Amended Certificate Regarding Compulsory Arbitration, First Amended Complaint upon Michael Volkin on 9/6/21. (Original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 9/9/21.) (JAM) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaverri et al v. Platinum LED Lights LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Chaverri
Represented By: Daniel Robert Warner
Represented By: Raeesabbas Mohamed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mito Red Light Incorporated
Represented By: Daniel Robert Warner
Represented By: Raeesabbas Mohamed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Platinum LED Lights LLC
Represented By: Bennett G Kelley
Represented By: Tamera C Shanker
Represented By: Bennet G Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Sawyer
Represented By: Bennett G Kelley
Represented By: Tamera C Shanker
Represented By: Bennet G Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Volkin
Represented By: Bennett G Kelley
Represented By: Tamera C Shanker
Represented By: Bennet G Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Volkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkinator Enterprises Incorporated
Represented By: Bennett G Kelley
Represented By: Tamera C Shanker
Represented By: Bennet G Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?