Offerpad Holdings LLC et al v. Bilbro et al
Plaintiff: Offerpad Holdings LLC and Offerpad Solutions Incorporated
Defendant: Greg Bilbro, Unknown Bilbro and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2021cv01772
Filed: October 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Greg Bilbro. (Speth, Maria)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 16(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court will issue a scheduling order after receiving the parties' Rule 26(f) report. After reviewing the Rule 26(f) report, the Court will set a case management conference if meeting with the parties appears necessary or helpful. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED as follows: The parties are directed to meet, confer, and develop a Rule 26(f) Joint Case Management Report, which must be filed no later than December 29, 2021 (see attached Order for details). Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 12/1/21. (MAW)
November 30, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #11 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. (DXD)
November 29, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Greg Bilbro.(Speth, Maria)
October 22, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE re: Filing of Exhibits by Offerpad Holdings LLC, Offerpad Solutions Incorporated . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Tazioli, Andrea)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant (s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on January 19, 2022, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 10/21/21. (MAW)
October 20, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Greg Bilbro. (MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 20, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Offerpad Holdings LLC. (MCO)
October 20, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(MCO)
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19984253. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1772-PHX-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
October 20, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Offerpad Holdings LLC, Offerpad Solutions Incorporated. (Kapteyn, Jeremy) (MCO)
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Offerpad Holdings LLC identifying Corporate Parent Offerpad Solutions Incorporated for Offerpad Holdings LLC. (Kapteyn, Jeremy) (MCO)
October 20, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Offerpad Solutions Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent First American Title Insurance Company, Corporate Parent First American Financial Corporation for Offerpad Solutions Incorporated. (Kapteyn, Jeremy) (MCO)
October 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19984253 filed by Offerpad Holdings LLC, Offerpad Solutions Incorporated. (Kapteyn, Jeremy) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Offerpad Holdings LLC et al v. Bilbro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Offerpad Holdings LLC
Represented By: Andrea Suzanne Tazioli
Represented By: Jeremy Kapteyn
Represented By: Mark W Williams
Represented By: Nicholas Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Offerpad Solutions Incorporated
Represented By: Andrea Suzanne Tazioli
Represented By: Jeremy Kapteyn
Represented By: Mark W Williams
Represented By: Nicholas Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Bilbro
Represented By: Aaron K Haar
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Bilbro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?