Glasgow v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Gina M Glasgow
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv01818
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for David F Chermol on behalf of Plaintiff Gina M Glasgow. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/29/2021. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting the #2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver or of the summons and complaint. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/29/2021. (LFIG)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-01818-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA)
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Gina M Glasgow. (Chermol, David) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SCA)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Gina M Glasgow. (Chermol, David) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(SCA)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Gina M Glasgow. (Chermol, David) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glasgow v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina M Glasgow
Represented By: David F Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?