Lacy v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Mona Lisa Lacy
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2021cv01908
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2021 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Mona Lisa Lacy: Notice of Service re: Summons upon Merrick B. Garland, US Attorney General (12/14/2021); Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of the Social Security Administration (12/9/2021); Glenn McCormick, Acting US Attorney for the District of Arizona (12/9/2021) on 12/14/2021; 12/9/2021; 12/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Larkin, Robin)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (BAS)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is denied. Plaintiff shall pay the filing fee within 10 days of this Order, or the Clerk of the Court shall dismiss this case (without prejudice) and enter judgment accordingly. (See Order for full details.) Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 11/19/21. (SST)
November 22, 2021 Civil Case Opening Fee Received: $ 402.00 receipt number 0970-20089428. (Larkin, Robin)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER - Within sixty (60) days after the answer is filed, Plaintiff must file an opening brief. Defendant must file an answering brief within thirty (30) days after service of Plaintiff's opening brief. Plaintiff may file a reply brief within fifteen (15) days after service of Defendant's brief. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 11/15/21. (MAP)
November 11, 2021 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1908-PHX-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
November 11, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Mona Lisa Lacy. (Larkin, Robin) (JAM)
November 11, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Mona Lisa Lacy. (Larkin, Robin) (JAM)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mona Lisa Lacy. (Larkin, Robin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lacy v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mona Lisa Lacy
Represented By: Robin Michelle Larkin
Represented By: Sarah Nicole Fern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?